Kansas Judicial Watch et al v. Stout

 
Case Number: 5:2006cv04056
Filed: May 24, 2006
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Topeka Office
Presiding Judge: Julie A. Robinson
Referring Judge: K. Gary Sebelius
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2009 119 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 114 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 116 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 11/19/2009. (mkc)
October 25, 2011 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER.Defendants Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. 134) is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants request for discovery is denied. Defendants shall respond to plaintiffs memorandum in support of its motion for attorneys fees and expenses no later than November 23, 2011. Plaintiffs may file a reply memorandum within 21 days of service of the response. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 10/25/2011. (pp)
March 27, 2012 147 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 127 Plaintiffs' Third Motion for Attorney Fees.Plaintiffs may file their Bill of Costs and memorandum in support according to the procedures set forth in D. Kan. Rule 54.1. The parties are ordered to meet and conf er and make a good faith attempt to negotiate any remaining claim by Plaintiffs for attorneys fees associated with responding to Defendants Petition for Certiorari before the United States Supreme Court. If Plaintiffs must file a supplemental declaration, it shall include a statement of consultation, and it shall be filed within fourteen (14) days of this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 3/27/2012. (pp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kansas Judicial Watch et al v. Stout
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]