Davis v. United States District Court for the District of Kansas

Defendant: United States District Court for the District of Kansas
Plaintiff: Anthony L. Davis
Case Number: 5:2011cv03135
Filed: July 18, 2011
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Topeka Office
County: Reno
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Nature of Suit: Mandamus and Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion 11 for reconsideration is denied. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 2/8/2012. (Mailed to pro se party Anthony L. Davis by regular mail.) (smnd)
March 7, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion 17 for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 3/7/2012. (Mailed to pro se party Anthony L. Davis by regular mail.) (smnd)
November 1, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ENTERED: The complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's pending motions 5 & 7 are rendered moot. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 11/1/2011. (Mailed to pro se party Anthony L. Davis by regular mail.) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. United States District Court for the District of Kansas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States District Court for the District of Kansas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony L. Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]