Mack v. United States of America et al

Defendant: FNU LNU (2), FNU LNU (1), United States of America and Corrections Corporation of America
Plaintiff: Cedric Mack
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv03090
Filed: April 9, 2012
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Topeka Office
County: Leavenworth
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
 
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2012 2 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff is granted thirty (30) days in which to satisfy the filing fee prerequisites. Within the same thirty-day period, plaintiff must submit his complaint upon court-provided forms and cure the deficiences in his form complaint. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 6/6/2012. (Mailed to pro se party Cedric Mack by regular mail.) (smnd)
August 22, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ENTERED: This action is dismissed and all relief is denied, without prejudice, for failure to state facts to support a claim. Plaintiff's application 4 to proceed without prepayment of fees is granted and he is assessed the filing fee of $350.00. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 8/22/2012. (Mailed to pro se party Cedric Mack by regular mail.) (smnd)
November 8, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion 7 for reconsideration is treated as a motion under Fed.R.Civ.P. 59(e) and denied. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 11/8/2012. (Mailed to pro se party Cedric Mack by regular mail.) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mack v. United States of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LNU (2)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LNU (1)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Corporation of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Mack
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]