Lynn v. Maddox et al

Plaintiff: Patrick C. Lynn
Defendant: Leonard Maddox and Anthony R. Hughes
Case Number: 5:2012cv03104
Filed: April 26, 2012
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Topeka Office
County: Leavenworth
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2013 137 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER finding as moot 103 Motion to Intervene; finding as moot 104 Motion for Order; finding as moot 105 Motion for Service; finding as moot 108 Motion for Order; granting in part and denying in part 118 Motion to Quash; finding as moot 121 Motion to Compel; denying 121 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/20/2013. Mailed to pro se party Patrick Lynn by regular mail. (df)
January 14, 2014 150 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 139 Motion for Reconsideration re 137 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion for Order, Order on Motion for Service, Order on Motion to Quash, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Hearing; denying 145 Motion for Order; denying 145 Motion for Hearing; denying 146 Motion to Compel; denying 146 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/14/2014. Mailed to pro se party Patrick Lynn by regular mail. (df)
December 3, 2014 201 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot 168 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 12/3/2014.Mailed to pro se party Patrick Lynn by regular mail. (smg)
December 4, 2014 203 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 189 Motion for Hearing; denying 189 Motion for Order; denying 190 Motion for Order; denying 191 Motion for Order; denying 192 Motion for Order; denying 199 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; denying 200 Motion for Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/4/14.Mailed to pro se party Patrick Lynn by regular mail. (aw)
December 15, 2014 208 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 12/15/2014. Mailed to pro se party Patrick Lynn by regular mail. (smg)
May 1, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Hughes' motion to dismiss is granted, with prejudice. No motion to reconsider, regardless of how it is styled, may be filed. Defendant Maddox's motion to dismiss is denied, without prejudice. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 5/1/2013. Mailed to Patrick Lynn via regular mail on 5/1/13. (alm)
September 18, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 67 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint; denying 68 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/18/2013. Mailed to pro se party Patrick Lynn by regular mail. (df)
September 18, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion for Protective Order; finding as moot 79 Motion for Order; finding as moot 80 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/18/2013. Mailed to pro se party Patrick Lynn by regular mail. (df)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynn v. Maddox et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick C. Lynn
Represented By: Robert C. Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Maddox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony R. Hughes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]