Parrish-Parrado v. Waddington et al

Respondent: Doug Waddington and Larned Correctional Facility
Petitioner: Daniel Joseph Parrish-Parrado
Case Number: 5:2012cv03120
Filed: May 16, 2012
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Topeka Office
County: Pawnee
Presiding Judge: Richard D. Rogers
Nature of Suit: Mandamus and Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 6, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: This matter is dismissed due to failure to state a claim for relief. Petitioner's motion 4 to appoint counsel and motion 8 for order are denied as moot. Signed by Senior District Judge Richard D. Rogers on 7/6/2012. (Mailed to pro se party Daniel Joseph Parrish-Parrado by regular mail.) (smnd)
July 30, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff is granted thirty (30) days from the date of this order to submit the $455.00 appellate filing fee to the clerk of this court. Signed by Senior District Judge Richard D. Rogers on 7/30/2012. (Mailed to pro se party Daniel Joseph Parrish-Parrado by regular mail.) (smnd)
May 18, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff is granted to and including June 18, 2012, to submit the $5.00 filing fee. The failure to pay the full filing fee by that time will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Senior District Judge Richard D. Rogers on 5/18/2012. (Mailed to pro se party Daniel Joseph Parrish-Parrado by regular mail.) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parrish-Parrado v. Waddington et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Doug Waddington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Larned Correctional Facility
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Joseph Parrish-Parrado
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]