Jones v. Kansas, State of et al

Defendant: Attorney General of Kansas, FNU LNU (1), Kansas, State of, Shawnee County, Topeka Police Department and Shawnee County Jail
Plaintiff: Joseph Lee Jones
Case Number: 5:2012cv03229
Filed: October 29, 2012
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Topeka Office
County: Shawnee
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $19.50 and this amount is immediately due and owing to the clerk of the court. Plaintiff's motions 2 & 12 to proceed without prepayment of fees are g ranted and plaintiff is assessed the remainder of the $350.00 filing fee. Plaintiff's remaining pending motions 9 , 11 , 14 , 15 , 19 , 20 , 21 , 22 , 25 , 31 , 33 , 34 , 35 , 37 and 42 are denied. This action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim and as frivolous. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 8/21/2013. (Mailed to pro se party Joseph Lee Jones by regular mail.) (smnd)
March 19, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion 47 for relief from judgment is treated as one under Rule 60(b) and denied. Plaintiff's motion 48 for leave to file an amended complaint is denied. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 03/19/14. (Mailed to pro se party Joseph Lee Jones by regular mail.) (smnd)
November 20, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff is given thirty (30) days to submit a motion to proceed without prepayment of fees that is on the appropriate court-provided forms with the requisite financial information attached, or proof that he has proper ly sought the financial information from the appropriate official but his request was improperly denied. Within the same thirty-day period, plaintiff is required to cure the deficiencies in his complaint or this action will be dismissed. All claims in the complaint that are challenges to plaintiff's state criminal convictions are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's motions 3 & 4 to appoint counsel and motion 6 for injunctive relief are denied. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 11/20/2012. (Mailed to pro se party Joseph Lee Jones by regular mail.) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Kansas, State of et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of Kansas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LNU (1)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas, State of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawnee County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Topeka Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawnee County Jail
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lee Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]