Manning (ID 51070) v. Deere

Respondent: Kyle Deere
Petitioner: Everett Manning
Case Number: 5:2012cv03254
Filed: December 13, 2012
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Topeka Office
County: Leavenworth
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The second amended petition for habeas corpus relief under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 (Dk. 9) is denied. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 9/23/14. Mailed to pro se party Everett Manning by regular mail.(mb)
January 23, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner's motion 3 to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Petitioner is granted thirty (30) days in which to file an amended petition in which he clearly sets forth all claims he intends to present in this case and shows that each claim has either been fully exhausted or, if unexhausted, should not be barred by procedural default. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 1/23/2013. (Mailed to pro se party Everett Manning by regular mail.) (smnd)
September 17, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner's motion 5 for stay of action is dismissed as moot. Petitioner's motion 6 to reinstate proceedings and motion 7 showing cause why petition should not be dismissed for failure exhaust are deni ed because he is not entitled to the actions requested. This petition for a writ of habeas corpus will be dismissed due to petitioner's failure to exhaust state court remedies as to all claims unless within thirty (30) days of this order petitioner files a complete Second Amended Petition upon court approved forms presenting only exhausted claims. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 9/17/2013. (Mailed to pro se party Everett Manning by regular mail.) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manning (ID 51070) v. Deere
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kyle Deere
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Everett Manning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]