Northern Natural Gas Company v. L.D. Drilling, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Northern Natural Gas Company
Defendant: L.D. Drilling, Inc., Val Energy, Inc. and Nash Oil & Gas, Inc.
 
Case Number: 6:2008cv01405
Filed: December 23, 2008
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Personal Property: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Donald W. Bostwick
Presiding Judge: Wesley E. Brown
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Conversion

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2009 152 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 33 Motion to Dismiss Party; denying 34 Motion to Dismiss Party; denying 108 Motion to Dismiss; denying 15 Motion to Dismiss Party; denying 21 Motion to Dismiss; granting 30 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The co urt orders that Case No. 08-1400 and the instant case (No. 08-1405) be consolidated for purposes of all pretrial proceedings and for trial. The instant case is hereby designated as the lead case, and all future filings in the consolidated action shall be made only in Case No. 08-1405. Signed by District Judge Wesley E. Brown on 11/6/09. (alm)
January 22, 2010 199 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 169 Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge; denying 170 Motion for Hearing; finding as moot 174 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by District Judge Wesley E. Brown on 01/22/2010. (aa)
February 1, 2010 222 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 110 Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 115 Defendants' Joint Motion for Protective Order; and entry of Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 2/1/2010. (Bostwick, Donald)
August 4, 2010 357 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 297 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order; granting 302 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; denying 333 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery. See Memorandum and Order for details. Telephone Scheduling Conference to be set for 8/18/2010 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 8/4/2010. (Bostwick, Donald)
September 29, 2010 382 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 279 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 281 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 283 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 292 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 294 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 298 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 331 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 241 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 266 Motion to Dismiss. See order for details. Signed by District Judge Wesley E. Brown on 09/29/2010. (aa)
December 22, 2010 420 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 341 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Wesley E. Brown on 12/21/2010. Please see order for details. (aa)
January 19, 2011 429 Featured Case Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Wesley E. Brown on 1/19/2011. (aa)
January 27, 2011 437 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 425 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery and setting procedure and timing for testing of wells. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 1/27/2011. (Bostwick, Donald)
February 15, 2011 445 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 438 Motion for Stay of Execution to Stay or Suspend Preliminary Injunction Order Pending Appeal. Signed by District Judge Wesley E. Brown on 2/15/2011. (alm)
August 11, 2011 474 Featured Case ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY and directing newly-added defendants to serve Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by 9/12/2011. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 8/11/2011. (Bostwick, Donald)
August 30, 2011 477 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 390 Motion to Amend Complaint; denying 400 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 451 Motion for Hearing; denying 457 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 462 Motion to Strike; denying 469 Motion to Stay or Hold. Northern is granted twenty days from the date of this order to file the Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Wesley E. Brown on 8/30/2011. (alm)
May 12, 2009 60 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 25 motion for preliminary injunction; granting 20 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Nash Oil & Gas, Inc; Deft' Nash's oral motion to stay the injunction is denied. Follows oral order of 5/1/09. Signed by District Judge Wesley E. Brown on 5/12/09.(cs) Modified on 5/12/2009 to show that the order also granted 25 (cs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Northern Natural Gas Company v. L.D. Drilling, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Natural Gas Company
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.D. Drilling, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Val Energy, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nash Oil & Gas, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]