Tanksley et al v. Bay View Law Group P.C. et al

Defendant: Jedediah N. Thurkettle, Bay View Law Group P.C., James L. Farley, Thom Lopez and Mahroze J. Baloch
Plaintiff: Wesley Tanksley and Amy Tanksley
 
Case Number: 6:2012cv01149
Filed: April 20, 2012
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Wichita Office
County: Sedgwick
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2012 19 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 8 Motion to Change Venue; granting 8 Motion to Compel. The court stays all proceedings with respect to these defendants and orders the parties to proceed to arbitration. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 10/15/12. (mm)
February 27, 2014 65 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 59 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Bay View Law Group, P.C. and denying in part as to Jedidiah N. Thurkettle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/27/14. (hw) Modified on 2/27/2014, to indicate the correct parties. (mh)
April 9, 2014 72 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 70 Renewed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. This denial is without prejudice to counsel filing a similar motion upon satisfying D. Kan. Rule 83.5.5 or providing an affidavit that shows reasonable efforts to comply with b oth alternatives of that local rule, i.e., certified mail and personal service. See Memorandum and Order for more details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 04/09/2014. (Mailed to pro se Defendant Mahroze J. Baloch by regular mail.) (bw)
May 29, 2014 76 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 36 Defendant Mahroze Baloch's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue; granting 39 Defendant Mahroze Baloch's Motion to Dismiss for F ailure to State a Claim; and denying 61 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Mahroze Baloch are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 05/29/2014.Mailed to pro se party Bay View Law Group P.C. by regular mail. (ts)
July 28, 2014 80 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 77 Second Renewed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorneys Camron L. Hoorfar and Lauren Hill are authorized to withdraw as counsel for Defendant Jedediah N. Thurkettle. All further service upon Jedediah N. Thurkettle shall be sent to 1011 Brioso Drive, Suite 101, Costa Mesa CA 92627. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 07/28/2014. Mailed to pro se parties Bay View Law Group P.C. and Jedediah N. Thurkettle by regular mail. (ts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Tanksley et al v. Bay View Law Group P.C. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jedediah N. Thurkettle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay View Law Group P.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Farley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thom Lopez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahroze J. Baloch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Tanksley
Represented By: Martin J. Peck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Tanksley
Represented By: Martin J. Peck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]