Nelson v. Acosta-Corrales et al

Plaintiff: Amanda Nelson
Defendant: Jose T. Acosta-Corrales and Deangelo Brothers, Inc.
 
Case Number: 6:2012cv01419
Filed: November 8, 2012
 
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Wichita Office
County: Saline
Referring Judge: James P. O'Hara
Presiding Judge: Julie A. Robinson
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 2, 2014 121 Featured Case ORDER denying 116 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/2/2014. (ah)
March 18, 2014 143 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 80 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 128 Motion for Summary Judgment on the Survival Action. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 3/17/14. (mb)
March 27, 2013 44 Featured Case ORDER: The court enters the parties' proposed agreed order authorizing disclosure of medical records of Christopher Scott Hays (deceased). The court amended the parties' proposed agreed order to remove language ordering non-parties to produce documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/27/2013. (ah)
April 8, 2013 50 Featured Case AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. The court finds good cause to enter, in large part, the protective order submitted by the parties. However, the court has deleted the last sentence of paragraph 7 and all of original paragraph 8, both of which violated Guid eline 3 (regarding filings under seal) of the District of Kansas Guidelines for Agreed Protective Orders. The court notes that it rejected the parties' first proposed protective order, in part because it also violated Guideline 3. The court sp ecifically directed the parties to Guideline 3 and asked them to submit an agreed protective order that conformed to the Guidelines. Yet, they did not. Counsel are admonished to review all of the District's local rules and guidelines before proceeding in this litigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/8/2013. (ah)
September 19, 2013 99 Featured Case ORDER granting 85 plaintiff's motion to compel defendant to sign an authorization to obtain his employment information from the Social Security Administration. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/19/2013. (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nelson v. Acosta-Corrales et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Nelson
Represented By: Stephen L. Brave
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose T. Acosta-Corrales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deangelo Brothers, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]