Barker v. Patrick Collins Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sabree Hutchinson and Jennifer Barker
Defendant: Malibu Media, LLC, Raw Films, LTD, K-Beech, Inc., Third Degree Films and Patrick Collins Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00372
Filed: July 5, 2012
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Simpson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 7/17/2013; 19 Motion for Discovery is DENIED; 25 Motion to Strike is DENIED. cc:counsel (TLB)
November 5, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 11/4/13; The Court concludes that Plaintiffs have failed to satisfy their burden of establishing personal jurisdiction over Defendants. Therefore, the Court will grant Defendants Motion to Dismiss. A separate order will be entered in accordance with this opinion. cc:counsel (JBM)
January 17, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 1/16/2014; re 41 MOTION to Reconsider; A separate order will be entered in accordance with this opinion.cc:counsel (TLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker v. Patrick Collins Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabree Hutchinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Barker
Represented By: Kenneth J. Henry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malibu Media, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raw Films, LTD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K-Beech, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Third Degree Films
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Collins Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]