Bourke et al v. Breshear et al

Plaintiff: Gregory Bourke, Michael Deleon and I.D.
Defendant: Bobbie Hosclaw, Jack Conway, Steve Breshear, Alison Lundergan Grimes and Elaine A. Filiatreau
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00750
Filed: July 26, 2013
 
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: John G. Heyburn
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 2/11/2014; re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Paul Campion, Jimmy Meade, Gregory Bourke, Luther Barlowe, Tamera Boyd, Michael Deleon, Kimberly Franklin, Randell Johnson. The Court will enter an order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion.cc:counsel (DAK)
March 19, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 3/19/2014 re 63 Motion to Stay; stay of this Court's February 27, 2014 final order is extended until further order of the Sixth Circuit. cc:counsel (TLB)
May 14, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by Senior Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 05/13/2014 sustaining 60 Motion for Attorney Fees. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for attorney's fees and costs is SUSTAINED and Plaintiffs are awarded $70,325.00 for attorney's fees and $453.00 for costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order is STAYED pending the resolution of Defendant's appeal before the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals. cc: Counsel of Record (TJD)
July 1, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 7/1/2014; re 77 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Timothy Love, Lawrence M Ysunza, Maurice Blanchard, Dominique James - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT to the extent Ky . Rev. Stat. §§ 402.005 and.020(1)(d) and Section 233A of the Kentucky Constitution deny same-sex couples the right to marry in Kentucky, they violate the Equal Protection Clause of the Fourteenth Amendment to the United States Constitut ion, and they are void and unenforceable. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that for all the reasons set forth in this Courts Memorandum Opinion and Orders in this case dated February 28, 2014 and March 19, 2014, the order here is STAYED until further order of the Sixth Circuit.This is a final and appealable order.cc:counsel (DAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bourke et al v. Breshear et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Bourke
Represented By: Shannon Renee Fauver(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Dawn R. Elliott(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Deleon
Represented By: Shannon Renee Fauver(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Dawn R. Elliott(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.D.
Represented By: Dawn R. Elliott
Represented By: Dawn R. Elliott
Represented By: Shannon Renee Fauver
Represented By: Shannon Renee Fauver
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobbie Hosclaw
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Conway
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Breshear
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison Lundergan Grimes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine A. Filiatreau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]