Banterra Bank v. Hendrick et al

Plaintiff: Banterra Bank
Defendant: Paul M. Hendrick and Thomas L. Osborne
Case Number: 5:2009cv00012
Filed: January 20, 2009
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Negotiable Instrument Office
County: McCracken
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Russell
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1446 Petition for Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 9/30/09; re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed filed by Banterra Bank; an appropriate order shall issue cc:counsel (KJS)
October 1, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 9/30/09; re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wayne Shelton; an appropriate order shall issue cc:counsel (KJS)
April 16, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 4/15/2010; re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wayne Shelton ; an appropriate order shall issuecc:counsel (KJA)
March 3, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting 51 Motion for Summary Judgment; defendant shall have ten (10) days to object tot he judgment; plaintiff shall have ten (10) days to demonstrate service of Hendrick.. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas B. Russell on 3/2/2011. cc:counsel (KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banterra Bank v. Hendrick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Banterra Bank
Represented By: Thomas J. Keuler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul M. Hendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas L. Osborne
Represented By: Thomas L. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.