Martinez v. White et al

Plaintiff: Leonel Martinez
Defendant: Randy White and Bill Harvey
Case Number: 5:2013cv00053
Filed: April 8, 2013
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Office: Paducah Office
County: Lyon
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Russell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying 5 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 6 Motion for Leave to File Once Copy of the Brief. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 4/22/2013. cc:counsel (KJA)
May 6, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. On initial review pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A, the Court will allow the 42 U.S.C. § 1983 equal-protection claim to proceed against Defendants Randy White and Bill Harvey and allow Plaintiff to file an amended complaint as to three other claims within 30 days from entry of this Order. All other claims are dismissed. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Defendants; General Counsel, Justice & Public Safety Cabinet (JLS)
April 10, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Greg N. Stivers granting 34 Motion to screen the 32 amended complaint. On screening, IT IS ORDERED that the claim that Plaintiff was denied prison employment based on race under the Equal Protection Claus e of the Fourteenth Amendment shall proceed against Defendants Patton, Lane, and Victoria. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other claims in the 32 amended complaint are DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b)(1) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; the official-capacity claims for damages also are DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b)(2) for seeking monetary relief from Defendants immune from such relief. All claims having been dismissed against Defe ndants Holliman, Grief, and Dunlap, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate them from this action. cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Defendants Holliman, Dunlap, Patton, Lane, Grief, and Victoria; Counsel of Record; General Counsel, Justice & Public Safety Cabinet (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. White et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonel Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]