Threadgill, et al v. Orleans Parish Sch, et al

Plaintiff: Butch Threadgill, Tom Weems and General Contracting and Consulting Services, LLC
Defendant: Orleans Parish School Board and Mitchell F Crusto
Cross_defendant: General Contracting and Consulting Services
Case Number: 2:2002cv01122
Filed: April 15, 2002
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Sarah S. Vance
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2011 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS GRANTING 104 MOTION TO LIFT STAY. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 12/15/2011.(Reference: 02-1122)(rll, ) Modified on 12/15/2011 to edit doc type (rll, ).
February 22, 2012 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS granting Orleans Parish School Board's 108 Motion to Dismiss; pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41, OPSB's crossclaims are dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/22/2012. (Reference: 02-1122)(rll, )
May 14, 2012 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS re 112 Motion for Declaratory Judgment: for the reasons stated, the Court's Judgment of 6/17/2009 remains in effect and the motion is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/14/2012. (Reference: All cases)(rll, )
February 28, 2013 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 133 Motion to Dismiss plaintiffs' claims against the City of New Orleans. Plaintiffs have until 3/10/13 to amend their complaint.. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance. (Reference: ALL CASES)(jjs, )(copy sent to Thomas Weems at general-adjuster@hotmail.com)
July 18, 2013 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting Crustos motion 172 to dismiss the City's contributory infringement cross-claim and denying Crusto's motion 172 to dismiss the City's indemnity crossclaim.. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/18/13. (Reference: 12-1460)(jjs, ) (Main Document 184 replaced on 7/18/2013) (jjs, ). Modified on 7/18/2013 (jjs, ). (Image replaced and remailed 7/18/13)
August 28, 2013 210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS the Court GRANTS Crustos motion 182 to dismiss OPSBs contributory infringement cross-claim and DENIES Crustos motion to dismiss OPSBs indemnity cross-claim. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/28/13. (Reference: 02-1460)(jjs, )
October 7, 2013 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting 200 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Party New Orleans City (02-1460) and New Orleans City dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/7/2012. (Reference: All Cases)(mmm)
October 7, 2013 249 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 192 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 207 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Party Orleans Parish School Board dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/7/2012. (Reference: 02-1122)(mmm)
October 31, 2013 256 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting 255 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/31/13. (Reference: ALL CASES)(jjs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Threadgill, et al v. Orleans Parish Sch, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Butch Threadgill
Represented By: David Paul Beach
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Weems
Represented By: David Allan Silverstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Contracting and Consulting Services, LLC
Represented By: David Paul Beach
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orleans Parish School Board
Represented By: William David Aaron, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell F Crusto
Represented By: Galen S. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: General Contracting and Consulting Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]