Gary et al v. New England Patriots et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs sued Defendants New England Patriots, New England Patriots LP and Bill Belichick on behalf of all those who purchased tickets and/or attended the 2002 Super Bowl, all St. Louis Ram employees on the 2002 Super Bowl team, and owners of the St. Louis Rams seat licenses for the 2001-2002 season. Plaintiffs allege that the taping of the St. Louis Rams\' walk-through for the Superbowl was a tortious interference with contractual relations, common law fraud, RICO Act violation, violation of rights as third party beneficiaries, breach of contract, and violation of the Louisiana unfair trade practices and consumer protection act.

Plaintiff: Willie Gary, Kevin Hacker, Peter Trout and Marcus Miller
Defendant: New England Patriots, Bill Belichick and New England Patriots Limited Partnership
 
Case Number: 2:2008cv01002
Filed: February 15, 2008
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Ivan L. R. Lemelle
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2008 10 Featured Case
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Ivan L. R. Lemelle.(lag, )
February 15, 2008 1
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against New England Patriots, New England Patriots Limited Partnership, Bill Belichick (Filing fee $ 350.) filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lag, )
February 19, 2008 3
AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants filed by Willie Gary. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Summons)(Young, John)
February 19, 2008 5
Rico Standing Order. by Clerk(lag, )
March 4, 2008 6
**WAITING ON FILING FEE** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed (Filing fee $5.00) by Willie Gary, Kevin Hacker, Peter Trout, Marcus Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Affidavit # 3 Affidavit)(Young, John) Modified on 3/5/2008 (lag, ).
March 10, 2008 8
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Case Filed by Willie Gary. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Young, John) Modified on 3/11/2008 (lag, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gary et al v. New England Patriots et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Gary
Represented By: John Leslie Young
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Hacker
Represented By: John Leslie Young
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Trout
Represented By: John Leslie Young
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Miller
Represented By: John Leslie Young
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New England Patriots
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Belichick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New England Patriots Limited Partnership
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]