David et al v. Signal InternationaL LLC et al

Plaintiff: Kurian David, Sony Vasudevan Sulekha, Palanyandi Thangamani, Maruganantham Kandhasamy, Hemant Khuttan, Andrews Issac Padaveettiyl, Dhananjaya Kechuru, Sabulal Vijayan, Krishan Kumar, Jacob Joseph Kaddakkarappally, Kuldeep Singh and Thanasekar Chellappan
Defendant: Signal InternationaL LLC, Malvern C. Burnett, Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, L.L.C., Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C., Indo-Ameri Soft L.L.C., Kurella Rao, J & M Associates, Inc. of Mississippi, Global Resources, Inc., Michael Pol, Sachin Dewan and Dewan Consultants Pvt. Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2008cv01220
Filed: March 7, 2008
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of Country
Referring Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Presiding Judge: Jay C. Zainey
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 15, 2011 1043 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1013 Motion for Partial Stay of Class Certification Proceedings as stated herein. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/14/2011. (gbw, )
September 21, 2012 1223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1199 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 9/21/12. (plh, ) Modified doc type on 9/21/2012 (plh, ).
June 11, 2013 1349 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 1196 Motion to Sever. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (cbn) (NEF: Mag. Judge Knowles)
July 15, 2013 1359 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 1355 Motion for Reconsideration (in limited part), as stated herein. Judge Zainey's case management plan remains in effect, as does this Court's ruling on Signal's motion to sever. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/15/2013. (NEF: MJ Knowles) (tsf)
August 7, 2013 1366 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING 1357 MOTION for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/7/13. (cbn)
August 19, 2013 1373 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS ENTERED IN 12-557: ORDERED that the EEOC's motion to bifurcate 141 be and hereby is GRANTED IN PART but DENIED to the extent it seeks a determination of its hostile work environment pattern or practice claim and its punitiv e damages claim in Phase I. The Court orders the EEOC to submit proposed Discovery Plan and Case Management Order, and a memorandum in support of its proposal, for Phase I and Phase II within fourteen (14) days of this Order as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(cbn) (NEF: Mag. Knowles)
October 14, 2013 1417 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 1389 Motion for Reconsideration, or in the alternative, for Clarification of Order. IT IS ORDERED that the Court's 1379 Order of 8/28/2013 is clarified to provide that the statutes of limitations are tolled through 8/28/2013, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/14/2013. (tsf)
October 22, 2013 1423 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS denying 1371 Motion to Protect Opt-In Plaintiffs FLSA Claims. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 10/22/2013. (gbw, )
February 12, 2014 1509 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 1466 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
September 11, 2008 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS that the 79 Motion to Dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted is DENIED; 123 Motion to Dismiss Class Claims is DENIED; 132 147 Motion for Joinder are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 9/11/08. (gbw, )
July 11, 2014 1677 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that 1661 Dewan's Motion for Protective Order be andhereby is GRANTED IN PART as set forth herein and otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
July 11, 2014 1678 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that 1653 Burnett's Motion for Protective Order be and hereby is GRANTED IN PART as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
August 12, 2014 1713 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 1431 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 1582 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 1594 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/12/2014. (bwn)
August 14, 2014 1722 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 1535 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
August 22, 2014 1734 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 1474 Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and the 1479 Motion to Compel Answers to Request for Production of Documents are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as set forth in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 8/22/14. (plh) Modified doc type on 8/22/2014 (plh).
October 14, 2014 1818 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 1776 Motion to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal or Alternatively to Stay Pending Application for Mandamus Relief; denying 1808 MOTION to Certify Orders for Interlocutory Appeal and to Join Signal's Motion for Stay and to Certify Orders for Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
November 19, 2014 1947 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and REASONS re: 1927 Motion for Reconsideration. ORDERED that the 1927 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 11/19/14. (plh)
October 24, 2008 228 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Order. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III: Motion Hearing held on 10/24/2008. Ordered that 197 MOTION to Take more than 10 depositions by Signal International LLC is GRANTED; Ordered that 211 MOTION to Quash Notices of Deposition of Unnamed Class Members is GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART as set forth in document. (sek, )
April 2, 2009 367 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS granting 315 Motion for Protective Order; dismissing as premature 319 Motion to Compel without prejudice as to plaintiffs right to reurge same after there is a determination of counsel as to Indo-Ameri Soft LLC and Rao Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 4/2/09. (sek, )
December 28, 2009 617 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 580 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Deposition Testimony or Alternatively for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel; as set forth in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 12/28/09. (sek, )
July 6, 2010 747 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that 723 Motion for a Finding of Contempt Against Signal International, L.L.C., for an Order Compelling Immediate Full Production of Documents and for an Order Requiring Signal International, L.L.C. to Remove Improper Redactions from Produced Documents is GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART as set forth in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 7/6/10. (sek, )
August 26, 2010 854 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 778 Motion to Compel as set forth in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 8/26/10. (sek, )
November 5, 2010 912 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 863 Motion for New Trial and/or Reconsideration of Discovery Order Pursuant to FRCP 59(e) Filed on Behalf of Signal International, L.L.C.; granting in part 868 Motion to Enforce Order of the Court Pursuant to Rule 37 of Federal Rule s of Civil Procedure in that plaintiffs shall produce to Signal the redacted affidavits attached to their T- and U-visa applications no later than ten (10) days from the date of this order. In all other respects, the motion is DENIED; granting 869 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 11/5/10. (sek, )
November 23, 2010 943 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 876 Motion for Leave to File 2nd Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 11/23/2010. (mmm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David et al v. Signal InternationaL LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurian David
Represented By: Tracie L. Washington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony Vasudevan Sulekha
Represented By: Tracie L. Washington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palanyandi Thangamani
Represented By: Tracie L. Washington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maruganantham Kandhasamy
Represented By: Tracie L. Washington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hemant Khuttan
Represented By: Tracie L. Washington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrews Issac Padaveettiyl
Represented By: Tracie L. Washington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dhananjaya Kechuru
Represented By: Tracie L. Washington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabulal Vijayan
Represented By: Tracie L. Washington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krishan Kumar
Represented By: Tracie L. Washington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Joseph Kaddakkarappally
Represented By: Tracie L. Washington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kuldeep Singh
Represented By: Tracie L. Washington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thanasekar Chellappan
Represented By: Tracie L. Washington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signal InternationaL LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malvern C. Burnett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Coast Immigration Law Center, L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Malvern C. Burnett, A.P.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indo-Ameri Soft L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurella Rao
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & M Associates, Inc. of Mississippi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Resources, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pol
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sachin Dewan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewan Consultants Pvt. Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]