Kelly v. Porter, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: John J Kelly
Defendant: Porter, Inc. and Charles Industries, Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2008cv04310
Filed: August 29, 2008
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: Marine Product Liability Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2010 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 95 Motion for Leave to File 2nd supplemental & amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 2/2/10. (Reference: 08-4310 & 08-4311)(sek, )
February 11, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 119 Motion to Expedite Hearing; denying 121 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 2/11/2010. (Reference: All Cases)(mmm, )
January 22, 2010 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by defendants Louisiana Yachting and Boating Center, L.L.C., Porter, Inc. and Charles Industries, Ltd. The Court DISMISSES the claims of plaintiff John J. Kelly in his individual capacit y and the claims of Maverick for all non-pecuniary damages. Further ORDERED granting in part and denying in part 61 Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by defendants Louisiana Yachting and B oating Center, L.L.C., Porter, Inc. and Charles Industries, Ltd. The Court DISMISSES only Great Lakes' claim for punitive damages. The design-defect claims the product-liability claims and Great Lakes' claim in redhibition survive summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 1/22/10. (Reference: 08-4310 & 08-4311)(sek, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Porter, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J Kelly
Represented By: Leonard Cardenas, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porter, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Industries, Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]