Gulf Production Company, Inc. v. Hoover Oilfield Supply, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Gulf Production Company, Inc.
Defendant: Hoover Oilfield Supply, Inc. and Polyflow, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2008cv05016
Filed: November 26, 2008
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: Contract Product Liability Office
County: St Tammany
Presiding Judge: Ivan L. R. Lemelle
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS DENYING Motion to Dismiss claims (doc. no. 6 filed in member case 09-104). Signed by Judge Ivan L. R. Lemelle on 11/16/09.(Reference: 09-104)(lag, )
March 11, 2011 294 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 279 Motion to Expedite Hearing on Motion to Quash and granting 278 Motion to Quash Notice of Deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 3/10/2011. (Reference: All cases)(rll, )
March 14, 2011 314 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 291 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 272 Motion to Strike Hoover's Motion for Review Of Magistrate Judge's Order. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 3/11/2011. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
April 4, 2011 401 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part State of Louisiana's 356 Motion to Quash Deposition of Trial Subpoenas of Kjel Brothen and Charles Bradbury as set forth in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 4/1/2011. (Reference: All cases)(rll, )
May 9, 2011 442 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part First Financial Insurance Company's 418 Motion to Quash Notices of Deposition as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 5/6/2011. (Reference: All cases)(rll, )
July 7, 2011 503 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that First Financial's 471 Motion to Quash ntc of depo is GRANTED; FURTHER ORDERED that Polyflow shall not be permitted to take the Corporate Deposition unless it limits the topics as set forth herein. FURTHER ORDERED that atty's fees are hereby imposed against Polyflow, Inc. FURTHER ORDERED that First Financial shall file a mtn to fix atty's fees by 7/20/11 & ntc for 8/3/11 w/out oral argument.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 7/7/11. (Reference: All cases)(bbc, )
July 20, 2011 511 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS denying 173 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 7/19/2011. (Reference: All cases)(lag, )
September 30, 2011 532 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 183 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (Reference: all cases)(ijg, )
November 3, 2011 544 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting First Financial Ins Co's 509 Motion for Attorney Fees & costs in the sum of $5,670.00 for the work performed on the Motions to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 11/2/11. (Reference: All cases)(bbc, )
January 11, 2012 576 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 568 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment on bad faith claims. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 1/10/2012. (Reference: All cases)(lag, )
August 24, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Motion to Dismiss Crossclaim. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 8/7/2010. (Reference: All cases)(lag, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gulf Production Company, Inc. v. Hoover Oilfield Supply, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gulf Production Company, Inc.
Represented By: John M. Robin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoover Oilfield Supply, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polyflow, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]