Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C. v. Salazar et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C.
Defendant: Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior, Robert Abbey and Minerals Management Service
Case Number: 2:2010cv01663
Filed: June 7, 2010
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Martin L.C. Feldman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 43:1349
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2011 293 Appeal Record on Loan to Kristofor R. Swanson re 290 Notice of Appeal, - 6 Volumes of Original Record and 7 Supplemental Record Volumes. (tsf, )
October 17, 2011 292 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 290 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 11-30936. (tsf, )
October 3, 2011 290 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior as to 280 Judgment,,,. (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) (Swanson, Kristofor)
September 7, 2011 289 Featured Case ORDER that the 287 Bill of Costs Taxed is amended to read as stated herein. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman.(tsf, )
September 6, 2011 288 OBJECTIONS by All Defendants re 287 Bill of Costs Taxed (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A)(Piropato, Marissa)
August 29, 2011 287 Bill of Costs Taxed in amount of $3,986.89. Signed by Clerk (tsf, )
August 26, 2011 286 Featured Case ORDER granting 283 Motion for Leave to File Signed Affidavit. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/25/2011. (caa, )
August 23, 2011 284 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 282 MOTION for Taxation of Costs. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Bill of Costs (before Clerk). Clerk took corrective action by re-docketing the event. No further action necessary at this time.(caa, )
August 23, 2011 283 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Signed Affidavit of Carl D. Rosenblum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Tax Costs by Alpha Marine Services, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C., Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Bollinger Larose LLC, Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Texas City, LP, C-Innovation, L.L.C., C-Port 2 LLC, C-Port LLC, Clean Tank, LLC, Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., Gulf Ship, L.L.C., Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Nautical Solutions LLC, Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., North American Fabricators, L.L.C., North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Reel Pipe LLC, Sea Fluids, L.L.C., Tampa Ship, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rosenblum, Carl)
August 19, 2011 285 BILL OF COSTS by All Plaintiffs before Clerk of Court. Any opposition should be filed within 14 days of the filing of this document. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 AO Form 133, # 4 Proposed Order)(caa, ) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/26/2011) (caa, ).
August 19, 2011 282 **ERROR: WRONG EVENT SELECTED** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Taxation of Costs by Alpha Marine Services, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C., Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Bollinger Larose LLC, Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Texas City, LP, C-Innovation, L.L.C., C-Port 2 LLC, C-Port LLC, Clean Tank, LLC, Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., Gulf Ship, L.L.C., Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Nautical Solutions LLC, Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., North American Fabricators, L.L.C., North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Reel Pipe LLC, Sea Fluids, L.L.C., Tampa Ship, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 FORM AO 133, # 3 Proposed Order)(Rosenblum, Carl) Modified on 8/23/2011 (caa, ).
August 5, 2011 281 Featured Case ORDER granting 279 MOTION to Withdraw John Suttles as Attorney filed by Center for Biological Diversity. Attorney John Timothy Suttles, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/5/2011.(caa, )
August 4, 2011 280 Featured Case JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plas & against Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, & Enforcement, United States Department of the Interior, Kenneth Lee Salazar, Michael Bromwich. ORDERED, ADJUDGED & DECREED, that Dfts were in civil contempt of this Courts Order of Prelim Inj. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED & DECREED, that Dfts must reimburse Plas for their losses arising from Dfts civil contempt, & Plas are awarded $528,801.18 in reasonable attorneys fees & $444.33 for costs; FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED & DECREED, that Plas taxable costs of court as calculated by the Clerk of Court are assessed against Dfts. Dfts shall bear their own taxable costs of court; & FINALLY ORDERED, ADJUDGED & DECREED that, except to the extent the Court grants relief by this Final Judgment, all remaining claims between the parties are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/3/2011.(caa, )
August 4, 2011 279 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw John Suttles as Attorney by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Suttles, John)
August 4, 2011 278 Featured Case ORDER AND REASONS denying in part 276 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/3/2011. (caa, )
August 1, 2011 277 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re 276 MOTION Entry of Final Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Piropato, Marissa)
July 13, 2011 276 MOTION Entry of Final Judgment by Alpha Marine Services, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C., Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Bollinger Larose LLC, Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Texas City, LP, C-Innovation, L.L.C., C-Port 2 LLC, C-Port LLC, Clean Tank, LLC, Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., Gulf Ship, L.L.C., Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Nautical Solutions LLC, Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., North American Fabricators, L.L.C., North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Reel Pipe LLC, Sea Fluids, L.L.C., Tampa Ship, L.L.C.. Motion set for 8/10/2011 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Submission, # 3 Proposed Order)(Rosenblum, Carl)
June 23, 2011 275 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 265 in substantial part, but also revises them in part. ORDER granting in part and denying in part 233 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/23/2011. (NEF: MAG-2)(caa, )
June 16, 2011 274 Featured Case ORDER granting 272 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/16/2011. (caa, )
June 15, 2011 273 OBJECTION to 265 Report and Recommendations and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objections by All Defendants (Piropato, Marissa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2011: # 1 Exhibit A - B) (caa, ).
June 15, 2011 272 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Seal by Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Piropato, Marissa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2011: # 3 Notice of Manual Attachment Proposed Pleading) (caa, ).
June 9, 2011 271 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on May 11, 2011 before Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr.. Court Reporter/Recorder Cindy Usner, Telephone number (504) 589-7723. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2011. (clu, )
June 7, 2011 270 OBJECTION to 265 Report and Recommendations On Quantum of Attorney's Fees by All Plaintiffs (Rosenblum, Carl)
June 7, 2011 269 Featured Case ORDER vacating 268 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/7/2011.(caa, )
June 6, 2011 268 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 265 , granting in part and denying in part 233 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/6/2011.(caa, )
June 1, 2011 267 Sign-in sheet for 5/11/11 hearing. (car, )
June 1, 2011 266 Featured Case ORDER AND REASONS granting 263 Motion to Request copy of sign in sheet. A copy of the sign-in sheet will be separately filed in the record and may be obtained from the Clerk of Court pursuant to the Clerks usual procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cms, )
June 1, 2011 265 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 233 MOTION for Attorney Fees - Objections to R&R due by 6/15/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr.(car, )
May 23, 2011 264 Featured Case ORDER re 263 MOTION/Letter requesting an order for a copy of the 5/11/11 sign in sheet - an written opp is due 5/31/11; thereafter, the motion will be decided on the record without oral argument.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr.(car, )
May 19, 2011 263 Letter to Mag Judge Wilkinson from Dr. Orly Taitz. (car, )
May 11, 2011 262 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 5/11/2011. Ordered that 252 MOTION to Intervene filed by Orly Taitz is DENIED. (sek, )
May 11, 2011 261 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Orly Taitz re 252 MOTION to Intervene. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(car, )
May 11, 2011 260 Featured Case ORDER granting 259 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (car, )
May 11, 2011 259 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply to opposition to motion to intervene by Orly Taitz. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading Reply, # 3 Proposed Pleading Exhibit)(caa, )
May 4, 2011 258 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 257 Response to Motion. Filing attorney selected incorrect event AND Document's signature line is blank. Correct event is RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event AND All future documents must reflect either an original signature or an electronic signature of the filing attorney following the format 's/ (attorney name)'. No further action necessary at this time.(caa, )
May 3, 2011 257 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants re 252 MOTION to Intervene by Orly Taitz. (Piropato, Marissa) Modified on 5/4/2011 (caa, ).
April 25, 2011 256 SEALED memo in opp (car, )
April 25, 2011 255 Featured Case ORDER granting 253 Motion for Leave to File opp under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (car, )
April 21, 2011 254 NOTICE by All Defendants of Manual Attachment. (Piropato, Marissa)
April 19, 2011 253 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Leave to File Opposition under seal by Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar and United States Department of the Interior. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Piropato, Marissa) Modified on 4/20/2011 (caa, ). Modified on 4/21/2011 (car, ).
March 30, 2011 251 Supplemental Appendix (caa, )
March 30, 2011 250 Featured Case ORDER granting 248 Motion for Leave to File suppl declaration; the suppl appendix shall be filed under seal as stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (car, )
March 29, 2011 249 Manual Attachment Received re 248 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration and Supplemental Appendix filed by Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, C-Port 2 LLC, Reel Pipe LLC, Nautical Solutions LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., Bollinger Texas City, LP, Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., Clean Tank, LLC, North American Fabricators, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Sea Fluids, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, C-Port LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Bee Mar LLC, Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Gulf Ship, L.L.C., Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Alpha Marine Services, L.L.C., Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C., Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, C-Innovation, L.L.C., North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Tampa Ship, L.L.C., Bollinger Larose LLC and Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C. (caa, )
March 28, 2011 252 MOTION to Intervene by Orly Taitz. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Motion set for 5/11/2011 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 8, # 2 Proposed Pleading, # 3 Proposed Pleading Exhibit 1 - 8)(caa, )
March 24, 2011 248 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration and Supplemental Appendix by Alpha Marine Services, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C., Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Bollinger Larose LLC, Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Texas City, LP, C-Innovation, L.L.C., C-Port 2 LLC, C-Port LLC, Clean Tank, LLC, Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., Gulf Ship, L.L.C., Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Nautical Solutions LLC, Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., North American Fabricators, L.L.C., North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Reel Pipe LLC, Sea Fluids, L.L.C., Tampa Ship, L.L.C.. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proposed Pleading)(Rosenblum, Carl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2011: # 4 Notice of Manual Attachment) (caa, ).
March 23, 2011 247 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Attorney Fees by Alpha Marine Services, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C., Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Bollinger Larose LLC, Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Texas City, LP, C-Innovation, L.L.C., C-Port 2 LLC, C-Port LLC, Clean Tank, LLC, Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., Gulf Ship, L.L.C., Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Nautical Solutions LLC, Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., North American Fabricators, L.L.C., North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Reel Pipe LLC, Sea Fluids, L.L.C., Tampa Ship, L.L.C. (Attachments: # 1 Second and Supplemental Declaration of Carl D. Rosenblum in Support of Motion to Set Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs)(Rosenblum, Carl) Modified on 3/23/2011 (caa, ).
March 14, 2011 246 Sealed Document (car, )
March 14, 2011 245 Featured Case ORDER granting 242 Motion to Seal Document pending further review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (car, )
March 11, 2011 244 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 243 Notice (Other). Document was incorrectly filed as a separate document instead of an attachment to document 242 . Clerk took corrective action. No further action is needed at this time.(caa, )
March 10, 2011 243 **ERROR: DOCKETED AS SEPARATE DOCUMENT ** NOTICE by Robert Abbey, Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior of Manual Attachment. (Piropato, Marissa) Modified on 3/11/2011 (caa, ).
March 9, 2011 242 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION to Seal Document 231 Order on Motion to Seal Document by Robert Abbey, Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Piropato, Marissa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2011: # 3 Notice of Manual Attachment) (caa, ).
March 2, 2011 241 Featured Case ORDER granting 240 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Marissa A Piropato for Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar, and United States Department of the Interior. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/2/2011. (caa, )
February 28, 2011 240 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Montero, Guillermo)
February 28, 2011 239 Featured Case ORDER granting 237 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (car, )
February 25, 2011 238 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 237 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Attorney's Fees and Costs. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event.(caa, )
February 24, 2011 237 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar and United States Department of the Interior. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Collins, Brian) Modified on 2/25/2011 (caa, ).
February 24, 2011 236 **DEFICIENT** NOTICE of Appearance by Marissa A Piropato on behalf of Robert Abbey, Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Minerals Management Service, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior. (Piropato, Marissa) Modified on 2/25/2011 (caa, ).
February 22, 2011 235 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 233 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the magistrate judge. Clerk took corrective action.(caa, )
February 22, 2011 234 Manual Attachment Received and Scanned re 233 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, C-Port 2 LLC, Reel Pipe LLC, Nautical Solutions LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., Bollinger Texas City, LP, Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., Clean Tank, LLC, North American Fabricators, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Sea Fluids, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, C-Port LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Bee Mar LLC, Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Gulf Ship, L.L.C., Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Alpha Marine Services, L.L.C., Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C., Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, C-Innovation, L.L.C., North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Tampa Ship, L.L.C., Bollinger Larose LLC, Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C. (caa, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2011: # 1 Exhibit D1, # 2 Exhibit D2) (caa, ).
February 18, 2011 233 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Attorney Fees by Alpha Marine Services, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C., Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Bollinger Larose LLC, Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Texas City, LP, C-Innovation, L.L.C., C-Port 2 LLC, C-Port LLC, Clean Tank, LLC, Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., Gulf Ship, L.L.C., Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Nautical Solutions LLC, Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., North American Fabricators, L.L.C., North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Reel Pipe LLC, Sea Fluids, L.L.C., Tampa Ship, L.L.C. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit, # 4 Affidavit, # 5 Affidavit, # 6 Notice of Manual Attachment, # 7 Proposed Order)(Rosenblum, Carl) Modified on 2/22/2011 (caa, ).
February 11, 2011 232 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 230 Motion for Expedited Consideration. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 2/10/2011. (gec, )
February 10, 2011 231 Featured Case ORDER granting 229 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 2/10/2011. (caa, )
February 9, 2011 230 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Moiton to File Appendix Under Seal by Alpha Marine Services, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C., Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Bollinger Larose LLC, Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Texas City, LP, C-Innovation, L.L.C., C-Port 2 LLC, C-Port LLC, Clean Tank, LLC, Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., Gulf Ship, L.L.C., Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Nautical Solutions LLC, Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., North American Fabricators, L.L.C., North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Reel Pipe LLC, Sea Fluids, L.L.C., Tampa Ship, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rosenblum, Carl)
February 9, 2011 229 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Seal Document by Alpha Marine Services, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C., Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Bollinger Larose LLC, Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Texas City, LP, C-Innovation, L.L.C., C-Port 2 LLC, C-Port LLC, Clean Tank, LLC, Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., Gulf Ship, L.L.C., Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Nautical Solutions LLC, Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., North American Fabricators, L.L.C., North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Reel Pipe LLC, Sea Fluids, L.L.C., Tampa Ship, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proposed Order)(Rosenblum, Carl)
February 4, 2011 228 Featured Case ORDER setting deadlines re 227 Order referring the issue of quantum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr.(NEF - J. Feldman)(car, )
February 3, 2011 227 Featured Case ORDER as noted int the Court's 226 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees the issue of quantum is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Wilkinson. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 2/3/2011. (NEF: MAG-2)(caa, )
February 2, 2011 226 Featured Case ORDER AND REASONS granting 213 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 2/2/2011. (caa, )
February 1, 2011 225 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re 213 MOTION for Attorney Fees. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(caa, )
February 1, 2011 224 Featured Case ORDER granting 221 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 2/1/2011. (caa, )
February 1, 2011 223 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 222 Reply to Response to Motion. Document was incorrectly filed as a separate document instead of an attachment to document 221 . Clerk took corrective action. No further action is needed at this time.(caa, )
January 31, 2011 222 **ERROR: DOCKETED AS SEPARATE DOCUMENT** REPLY to Response to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rosenblum, Carl) Modified on 2/1/2011 (caa, ).
January 31, 2011 221 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Alpha Marine Services, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C., Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Bollinger Larose LLC, Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Texas City, LP, C-Innovation, L.L.C., C-Port 2 LLC, C-Port LLC, Clean Tank, LLC, Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., Gulf Ship, L.L.C., Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Nautical Solutions LLC, Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., North American Fabricators, L.L.C., North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Reel Pipe LLC, Sea Fluids, L.L.C., Tampa Ship, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rosenblum, Carl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2011: # 3 Proposed Pleading, # 4 Proposed Pleading Exhibit) (caa, ).
January 27, 2011 220 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior re 213 MOTION for Attorney Fees. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Montero, Guillermo)
January 25, 2011 219 Featured Case ORDER granting 218 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 1/25/2011. (caa, )
January 24, 2011 218 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 213 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Montero, Guillermo)
December 29, 2010 217 Featured Case ORDER granting 216 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Diamond Offshore Company and Diamond Offshore Management Company dismissed. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 12/29/2010. (caa, )
December 28, 2010 216 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party, Intervenors Diamond Offshore Company and Diamond Offshore Management Company, by Diamond Offshore Company, Diamond Offshore Management Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baynham, Thomas)
December 8, 2010 215 Featured Case ORDER granting 214 MOTION to Continue Hearing and Extend Amendment Deadline filed by all parties, Resetting Hearing on 213 MOTION for Attorney Fees for 2/2/2011. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 12/8/2010.(caa, )
December 8, 2010 214 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Hearing and Extend Amendment Deadline by Robert Abbey, Alpha Marine Services, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C., Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Bollinger Larose LLC, Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Texas City, LP, Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, C-Innovation, L.L.C., C-Port 2 LLC, C-Port LLC, Clean Tank, LLC, Florida Wildlife Federation, Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., Gulf Ship, L.L.C., Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Minerals Management Service, Nautical Solutions LLC, Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., North American Fabricators, L.L.C., North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Reel Pipe LLC, Kenneth Lee Salazar, Sea Fluids, L.L.C., Tampa Ship, L.L.C., United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rosenblum, Carl)
December 3, 2010 213 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Alpha Marine Services, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C., Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Bollinger Larose LLC, Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Texas City, LP, C-Innovation, L.L.C., C-Port 2 LLC, C-Port LLC, Clean Tank, LLC, Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., Gulf Ship, L.L.C., Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Nautical Solutions LLC, Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., North American Fabricators, L.L.C., North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Reel Pipe LLC, Sea Fluids, L.L.C., Tampa Ship, L.L.C.. Motion Hearing set for 1/5/2011 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Notice of Hearing)(Rosenblum, Carl)
December 2, 2010 212 Featured Case ORDER granting 209 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Adam Babich for Center for Biological Diversity. Attorney Catherine Moore Wannamaker terminated. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 12/2/2010. (caa, )
December 2, 2010 211 Featured Case ORDER granting 208 Motion for Withdrawal of Intervenor Defendants. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 12/2/2010. (caa, )
December 1, 2010 210 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 208 MOTION for Withdrawal of Intervenor Defendants. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?' before clicking the Next button. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte'.(caa, )
December 1, 2010 209 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Adam Babich to be substituted in place of Catherine M. Wannamaker by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wannamaker, Catherine)
December 1, 2010 208 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Withdrawal of Intervenor Defendants by Defenders of Wildlife and Natural Resources Defense Council. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wannamaker, Catherine) Modified on 12/1/2010 (caa, ).
November 23, 2010 207 Appeal Record Returned (original exhibits and/or non-electronic documents) from U.S. Court of Appeals: 74 Notice of Appeal and 88 Notice of Appeal, (caa, )
November 23, 2010 206 USCA JUDGMENT issued as mandate on 11/23/2010 as to 74 Notice of Appeal filed by Robert Abbey, United States Department of the Interior, Minerals Management Service and Kenneth Lee Salazar and 88 Notice of Appeal, filed by Florida Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife and Sierra Club. Ordered and adjudged that the appeal is dismissed as moot. Further Ordered that each party bear its own costs on appeal. USCA judge name: Jolly, DeMoss and Dennis. (Attachments: # 1 Opinion)(caa, )
November 22, 2010 205 Featured Case ORDER that paragraphs 90 and 91 of the plaintiff's 5 First Supplemental and Amended Complaint are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/22/2010.(caa, )
November 18, 2010 204 STIPULATION by All Plaintiffs (Rosenblum, Carl)
November 9, 2010 203 Featured Case ORDER re 202 Status Conference. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/9/2010.(caa, )
November 9, 2010 202 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman: Status Conference held on 11/9/2010. (caa, )
November 9, 2010 201 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/27/2011 01:30 PM and Bench Trial set for 10/11/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Notice Form)(caa, )
November 4, 2010 200 Featured Case ORDER re 198 attendance at Status Conference set for 11/9/2010. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/4/2010.(caa, )
November 3, 2010 199 Featured Case ORDER denying 181 Motion for Leave to File Intervention. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/3/2010. (caa, )
October 29, 2010 198 Featured Case ORDER Status Conference set for 11/9/2010 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/29/2010.(caa, )
October 26, 2010 197 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior re 181 MOTION for Leave to File Intervention. (Swanson, Kristofor)
October 20, 2010 196 Featured Case ORDER Resetting Hearing on 181 MOTION for Leave to File Intervention for 11/3/2010 on the papers. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/20/2010.(caa, )
October 19, 2010 195 Featured Case ORDER granting 193 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/19/2010. (caa, )
October 15, 2010 194 Featured Case ORDER granting 191 Motion to amend motion to intervene. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/15/2010. (caa, )
October 15, 2010 193 EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 181 MOTION for Leave to File Intervention by Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Montero, Guillermo)
October 15, 2010 192 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 191 MOTION leave to amend Motion to Intervene. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?' before clicking the Next button. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte'.(caa, )
October 14, 2010 191 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION leave to amend Motion to Intervene by Bobby Jindal, Louisiana State. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Local Rule 7.6E Certificate)(Dart, Henry) Modified on 10/15/2010 (caa, ).
October 14, 2010 190 **DEFICIENT** Notice of Compliance Local Rule 7.6E Certificate by Bobby Jindal, Louisiana State re 181 MOTION for Leave to File Intervention. (Dart, Henry) Modified on 10/14/2010 (caa, ).
October 12, 2010 189 Featured Case ORDER granting 188 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/12/2010. (caa, )
October 8, 2010 188 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 181 MOTION for Leave to File Intervention by Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Collins, Brian)
October 6, 2010 187 ANSWER to 130 Intervenor Complaint by Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior.(Swanson, Kristofor)
October 6, 2010 186 ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint by Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior.(Swanson, Kristofor) Modified text on 10/7/2010 (gec, ).
September 30, 2010 185 Featured Case ORDER denying 167 Motion to Enforce Judgment. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/30/2010. (caa, )
September 28, 2010 184 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Florida Wildlife Federation, Sierra Club re 167 MOTION to Enforce Judgment (Preliminary Injunction Order). (Babich, Adam) Modified on 9/29/2010 (caa, ).
September 28, 2010 183 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar and United States Department of the Interior re 167 MOTION to Enforce Judgment (Preliminary Injunction Order). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Swanson, Kristofor) Modified on 9/29/2010 (caa, ).
September 28, 2010 182 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 181 MOTION for Leave to File Intervention. Attachments have duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is necessary at this time.(caa, )
September 27, 2010 181 MOTION for Leave to File Intervention by Bobby Jindal and Louisiana State. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2010 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Notice of Hearing, # 4 Proposed Pleading, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B)(Dart, Henry) Modified on 9/28/2010 (caa, ).
September 23, 2010 180 Featured Case ORDER AND REASONS denying 168 Request/Statement of Oral Argument filed by all plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/23/2010.(caa, )
September 10, 2010 179 Featured Case ORDER granting 173 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 5 Amended Complaint, 1 Complaint, and 130 Intervenor Complaint as to Michael Bromwich; Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement; Kenneth Lee Salazar; and United States Department of the Interior answer due 10/6/2010. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/10/2010. (caa, )
September 10, 2010 178 Featured Case ORDER granting 171 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/10/2010. (caa, )
September 10, 2010 177 Featured Case ORDER granting 170 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/10/2010. (caa, )
September 10, 2010 176 Featured Case ORDER Resetting Hearing on 167 MOTION to Enforce Judgment (Preliminary Injunction Order) to 10/6/2010. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/10/2010.(caa, )
September 10, 2010 175 Featured Case ORDER granting 174 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/10/2010. (caa, )
September 10, 2010 174 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Defendants' Motion to Extend Answer Deadline by Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Collins, Brian)
September 10, 2010 173 EXPARTE/CONSENT Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re 5 Amended Complaint,,,, 130 Intervenor Complaint by Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Collins, Brian)
September 9, 2010 172 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 171 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce. Filing attorney incorrectly selected Robert Abbey, and Minerals Management Service as filers. Correct filer(s) is Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar and United States Department of the Interior. Clerk took corrective action. No further action to take at this time.(caa, )
September 9, 2010 171 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce by Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar and United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Collins, Brian) Modified on 9/9/2010 (caa, ).
September 9, 2010 170 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 167 MOTION to Enforce Judgment (Preliminary Injunction Order) by Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar and United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Collins, Brian) Modified on 9/9/2010 (caa, ).
September 8, 2010 169 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 167 MOTION to Enforce Judgment (Preliminary Injunction Order). Filing attorney attached a Request/Statement for Oral Argument to this motion instead of filing it as a separate entry. Clerk took corrective action by separating the request and docketing it as a separate entry. All future requests for oral argument must be filed separately. (gec, )
September 7, 2010 168 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by All Plaintiffs regarding 167 MOTION to Enforce Judgment (Preliminary Injunction Order). (gec, )
September 7, 2010 167 MOTION to Enforce Judgment (Preliminary Injunction Order) by Alpha Marine Services, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C., Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Bollinger Larose LLC, Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Texas City, LP, C-Innovation, L.L.C., C-Port 2 LLC, C-Port LLC, Clean Tank, LLC, Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., Gulf Ship, L.L.C., Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Nautical Solutions LLC, Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., North American Fabricators, L.L.C., North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Reel Pipe LLC, Sea Fluids, L.L.C., Tampa Ship, L.L.C.. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2010 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Notice of Hearing, # 4 Request for Oral Argument)(Rosenblum, Carl)
September 2, 2010 166 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 74 Notice of Appeal (caa, )
September 1, 2010 165 Featured Case ORDER AND REASONS denying without prejudice 125 Motion to Dismiss Case, or alternatively Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/1/2010. (caa, )
August 25, 2010 164 Manual Attachment Received re 158 Supplemental Memorandum, filed by Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, United States Department of the Interior, Kenneth Lee Salazar, Michael Bromwich. (caa, )
August 25, 2010 163 Amicus Brief by Bobby Jindal and Louisiana State in opposition to 125 MOTION to Dismiss Case, MOTION to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(caa, )
August 25, 2010 162 Featured Case ORDER granting 159 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/25/2010. (caa, )
August 25, 2010 161 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 160 Notice (Other). Document was incorrectly filed as a separate document instead of an attachment to document 158 as Notice of Manual Attachment. All future Manual Attachments must be filed as attachment. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is needed at this time.(caa, )
August 24, 2010 160 **ERROR: DOCKETED AS SEPARATE DOCUMENT** NOTICE by Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior re 158 Supplemental Memorandum, Notice of Filing of CD-ROM. (Montero, Guillermo) Modified on 8/25/2010 (caa, ).
August 24, 2010 159 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Bobby Jindal, Louisiana State. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proposed Pleading Amicus Curiae Brief, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit "A" to Amicus Curiae Brief)(Dart, Henry)
August 24, 2010 158 Supplemental Memorandum by Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior in Response to Court's Orders Dated August 11 and 17, 2010 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jamie L. Burley, # 2 Declaration of Neal Kemkar, # 3 Declaration of Raya Bakalov)(Montero, Guillermo) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2010: # 4 Notice of Manual Attachment) (caa, ).
August 24, 2010 157 Supplemental Memorandum by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Rosenblum, Carl)
August 17, 2010 156 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as stated herein, as to 74 Notice of Appeal filed by Robert Abbey, United States Department of the Interior, Minerals Management Service, Kenneth Lee Salazar and 88 Notice of Appeal, filed by Florida Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife and Sierra Club. USCA Judge: Jolly, DeMoss and Dennis. (caa, )
August 17, 2010 153 Featured Case ORDERED that the parties' supplemental briefs on defendant's motion to dismiss are due by 8/24/2010 5:00 PM as stated within document. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman.(gec, )
August 16, 2010 155 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 74 Notice of Appeal filed by Robert Abbey, United States Department of the Interior, Minerals Management Service and Kenneth Lee Salazar that the motion of appellants Center for biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife and Natural Resources Defense Council for leave to file a reply in support of their petition for writ of mandamus is granted. Signed by Clerk of Court, USCA, 5th Circuit. (caa, )
August 13, 2010 154 Featured Case ORDER of USCA that the appellants' Defenders of Wildlife, Center for Biological Diversity, and Natural Resources Defense Council petition for writ of mandamus is DENIED. By Clerk, entered at the direction of the court. (gec, )
August 13, 2010 152 TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument held on 08-11-2010 before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. Court Reporter/Recorder Toni Tusa, Telephone number 504-589-7778. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2010. (bgh, )
August 11, 2010 151 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman: Motion Hearing held on 8/11/2010 re 125 MOTION to Dismiss/Stay Order Granting Preliminary Injunction. Matter taken under submission. Post hearing briefing due 8/18/2010 5:00 PM. (Court Reporter Toni Tusa.) (gec, )
August 6, 2010 150 Supplemental Memorandum filed by All Plaintiffs, in opposition of 125 MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION to Stay. (caa, )
August 6, 2010 149 Featured Case ORDER granting 148 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/6/2010. (caa, )
August 5, 2010 148 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Alpha Marine Services, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C., Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Bollinger Larose LLC, Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Texas City, LP, C-Innovation, L.L.C., C-Port 2 LLC, C-Port LLC, Clean Tank, LLC, Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., Gulf Ship, L.L.C., Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Nautical Solutions LLC, Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., North American Fabricators, L.L.C., North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Reel Pipe LLC, Sea Fluids, L.L.C., Tampa Ship, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit)(Rosenblum, Carl)
July 29, 2010 147 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar and United States Department of the Interior re 125 MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION to Stay. (caa, )
July 29, 2010 146 Featured Case ORDER granting 144 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/29/2010. (caa, )
July 29, 2010 145 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 144 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Filing attorney did not select category 'Proposed Pleading' when attaching document for which leave to file is being requested. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is necessary at this time.(caa, )
July 28, 2010 144 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar and United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit: Proposed Pleading)(Montero, Guillermo) Modified on 7/29/2010 (caa, ).
July 27, 2010 143 Amicus Curiae Brief by Offshore Marine Services Association in support of 134 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(1). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - D)(caa, )
July 27, 2010 142 Featured Case ORDER granting 141 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/27/2010. (caa, )
July 26, 2010 140 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 139 Amicus Curiae Appearance. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is MOTION for leave to File a Document. Clerk took corrective action by re-docketing the event.(caa, )
July 23, 2010 141 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Offshore Marine Services Association. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proposed Pleading, # 4 Proposed Pleading Exhibit A - D)(caa, )
July 23, 2010 139 **ERROR: WRONG EVENT SELECTED** Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Offshore Marine Services Association (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proposed Pleading, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D)(Sevin, Kelley) Modified on 7/26/2010 (caa, ).
July 22, 2010 138 Featured Case ORDER Setting/Resetting Hearing on 125 MOTION to Dismiss Case or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay: Motion Hearing continued to 8/11/2010 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman.(gec, )
July 22, 2010 137 STATUS REPORT Pursuant to June 22, 2010 Order by Robert Abbey, Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Minerals Management Service, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior (Montero, Guillermo)
July 21, 2010 136 Featured Case ORDER denying 115 Motion to Set Aside Preliminary Injunction Order and Request that the Court Indicate It Would Vacate Such Order Upon Remand. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/21/2010. (caa, )
July 20, 2010 135 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by All Defendants regarding 125 MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION to Stay (Collins, Brian)
July 20, 2010 134 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re 125 MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION to Stay. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Rosenblum, Carl)
July 16, 2010 133 Featured Case ORDER granting 114 Motion to Expedite hearing on Motion to Disqualify Judge and denying 113 Motion to Disqualify Judge. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/16/2010. (caa, )
July 16, 2010 132 Featured Case ORDER denying 127 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/16/2010. (caa, )
July 14, 2010 131 Featured Case ORDER granting 124 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David Pettit. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/14/2010. (caa, )
July 14, 2010 130 Intervenor COMPLAINT filed by Diamond Offshore Management Company, Diamond Offshore Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibits 2-8, # 3 Exhibit 9, # 4 Exhibits 10-13)(car, )
July 14, 2010 129 Featured Case ORDER granting 81 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (car, ) (NEF - J. Feldman)
July 14, 2010 128 Featured Case ORDER granting 123 Motion to Appear for Attorney Kristofor R. Swanson for Michael Bromwich; Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement; Kenneth Lee Salazar; United States Department of the Interior. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (gec, )
July 13, 2010 126 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 125 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Circuit Courts Decision on Defendants Motion to Vacate the Preliminary Injunction. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is MOTION to Dismiss Case. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event.(caa, )
July 12, 2010 127 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Robert Parrish. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading)(caa, )
July 12, 2010 125 MOTION to Dismiss Case or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Circuit Courts Decision on Dfts Motion to Vacate the Preliminary Injunction by Robert Abbey, Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Minerals Management Service, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2010 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Notice of Hearing, # 4 Declaration of Walter D. Cruickshank)(Montero, Guillermo) Modified on 7/13/2010 (caa, ).
July 12, 2010 124 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David Pettit (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 053L-2517465) by Natural Resources Defense Council. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Suttles, John) Modified on 7/12/2010 (caa, ).
July 12, 2010 123 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear as Counsel of Record as Additional Co-Counsel by Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Montero, Guillermo)
July 9, 2010 122 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Robert Abbey, Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Minerals Management Service, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior re 81 Emergency MOTION to Intervene. (Montero, Guillermo)
July 9, 2010 121 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 74 Notice of Appeal filed by Robert Abbey, United States Department of the Interior, Minerals Management Service and Kenneth Lee Salazar; the motion for stay pending appeal is denied; the Secretary has the right to apply for emergency relief if he can show that drilling activity be deepwater rigs has commenced or is about to commence; further ordered that this appeal be expedited to a merits panel. USCA, 5th Circuit Judges: Davis, Smith and Dennis. (caa, )
July 7, 2010 119 Featured Case AMENDING ORDER re 67 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/7/2010.(caa, )
July 7, 2010 118 **DEFICIENT** NOTICE of Appearance by Kristofor R. Swanson on behalf of Michael Bromwich, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior. (Swanson, Kristofor) Modified on 7/7/2010 (caa, ).
July 7, 2010 117 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 74 Notice of Appeal filed by Robert Abbey, United States Department of the Interior, Minerals Management Service and Kenneth Lee Salazar; ORDERED that the motions of International Association of Drilling Contractors and Independent Petroleum Association of America for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae in opposition to the motion for stay pending appeal is GRANTED. Signed by Clerk of Court, USCA, 5th Circuit. (caa, )
July 6, 2010 120 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Florida Wildlife Federation and Sierra Club re 88 Notice of Appeal. (caa, )
July 2, 2010 116 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Florida Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club regarding 115 MOTION to Set Aside Preliminary Injunction Order (Wannamaker, Catherine)
July 2, 2010 115 MOTION to Set Aside Preliminary Injunction Order by Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Florida Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2010 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Hearing)(Wannamaker, Catherine)
July 2, 2010 114 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite by Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Florida Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Wannamaker, Catherine)
July 2, 2010 113 MOTION to Disqualify Judge by Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Florida Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2010 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Notice of Hearing, # 12 Proposed Order)(Wannamaker, Catherine)
July 2, 2010 111 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 110 Statement. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Notice of Compliance. Clerk took corrective action by re-docketing the event. (caa, )
July 1, 2010 112 Notice of Compliance, Local Rule 7.6E Certificate, by Diamond Offshore Company and Diamond Offshore Management Company to 91 Order. (caa, )
July 1, 2010 110 **ERROR: WRONG EVENT SELECTED** Statement by Diamond Offshore Company, Diamond Offshore Management Company Local Rule 7.6E Certificate (Weiner, Anthony) Modified on 7/2/2010 (caa, ).
July 1, 2010 109 Featured Case ORDER granting 85 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Anthony D. Weiner. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/1/2010. (caa, )
July 1, 2010 108 Featured Case ORDER granting 84 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Paul J. Dobrowski. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/1/2010. (caa, )
June 30, 2010 107 Featured Case ORDER granting 104 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mitchell S. Bernard. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (gec, )
June 30, 2010 106 Featured Case ORDER granting 103 Motion to Substitute Original Declaration of Ford Brett. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (gec, )
June 29, 2010 105 Featured Case ORDER granting 94 Motion to Substitute Party. Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement and Michael Bromwich added. Robert Abbey and Minerals Management Service terminated. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/29/2010. (caa, )
June 29, 2010 104 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mitchell S. Bernard (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 053L-2501194) by Natural Resources Defense Council. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Suttles, John) Modified on 6/29/2010 (caa, ).
June 28, 2010 103 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for leave to Supplement the Record and Substitute original Declaration by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Pleading, # 3 Proposed Order)(caa, ) Modified on 6/29/2010 (caa, ).
June 28, 2010 102 SUMMONS Returned Executed; United States Department of the Interior served on 6/14/2010, answer due 8/13/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(caa, )
June 28, 2010 101 SUMMONS Returned Executed; United States Department of the Interior served on 6/14/2010, answer due 8/13/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(caa, )
June 28, 2010 100 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Kenneth Lee Salazar served on 6/14/2010, answer due 8/13/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(caa, )
June 28, 2010 99 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Kenneth Lee Salazar served on 6/14/2010, answer due 8/13/2010. (caa, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2010: # 1 Exhibit) (caa, ).
June 28, 2010 98 SUMMONS Returned Executed; United States Department of the Interior served through the U.S. Attorney, EDLA, on 6/11/2010, answer due 8/10/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(caa, )
June 28, 2010 97 SUMMONS Returned Executed; United States Department of the Interior served through the U.S. Attorney, EDLA, on 6/8/2010, answer due 8/9/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(caa, )
June 28, 2010 96 SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Attorney General served, no date provided. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(caa, )
June 28, 2010 95 SUMMONS Returned Executed; U.S. Attorney General served, no date provided. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(caa, )
June 28, 2010 94 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Party. Party Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement; Michael Bromwich, in his official capacity as director, Bureau of Ocean Energy Management, Regulation, and Enforcement to be substituted in place of Minerals Management Service; Robert Bob Abbey, in his official capacity as acting director, Minerals Management Service by Alpha Marine Services, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C., Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Bollinger Larose LLC, Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Texas City, LP, C-Innovation, L.L.C., C-Port 2 LLC, C-Port LLC, Clean Tank, LLC, Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., Gulf Ship, L.L.C., Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Nautical Solutions LLC, Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., North American Fabricators, L.L.C., North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Reel Pipe LLC, Sea Fluids, L.L.C., Tampa Ship, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Proposed Order)(Rosenblum, Carl)
June 25, 2010 92 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 74 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 10-30585. (caa, )
June 25, 2010 91 Featured Case ORDER re 86 MOTION to Expedite the 81 Emergency MOTION to Intervene filed by Diamond Offshore Management Company, Diamond Offshore Company - no later than July 2, 2010, Diamond Offshore must file the certificate required by Local Rule 7.6E. Written opposition to Diamond Offshore's motion to intervene, if any, must be filed no later than July 9, 2010. Thereafter, Diamond Offshore's Emergency Motion to Intervene will be determined on the briefs without oral argument. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is hereby directed to strike from the record Diamond Offshore's 32-page "Brief in Support of Injunctive Relief," Record Doc. No. 81-4, because it violates Local Rule 7.8.1E.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr.(car, )
June 24, 2010 90 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 76 Motion to Expedite Motion for Stay Pending Appeal or in the Alternative for a Temporary Stay. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/24/2010. (caa, )
June 24, 2010 89 Featured Case ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave to File Supplement to Administrative Record and granting 29 Motion for Leave to File Affidavits and Declaration for the purpose of supplementing the Court's record, not the administrative record. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/24/2010. (caa, )
June 24, 2010 88 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Florida Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club as to 68 Order,,, 67 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 053L-2495843.) (Coe, Alisa)
June 24, 2010 87 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 86 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Emergency Motion to Intervene. Filing attorney should have selected 'No' at the question 'Set motion for hearing Y/N?' Exparte/Consent motions are NOT set for hearing. Clerk has removed hearing date.(caa, )
June 24, 2010 86 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Emergency Motion to Intervene by Diamond Offshore Company, Diamond Offshore Management Company. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Notice of Hearing)(Baynham, Thomas) Modified on 6/24/2010 (caa, ).
June 24, 2010 85 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anthony D. Weiner (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 053L-2495278) by Diamond Offshore Company, Diamond Offshore Management Company. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibits A, A-1 and B)(Baynham, Thomas)
June 24, 2010 84 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul J. Dobrowski (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 053L-2495263) by Diamond Offshore Company, Diamond Offshore Management Company. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibits A, A-1 and B)(Baynham, Thomas)
June 24, 2010 83 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 81 Emergency MOTION to Intervene. Filing attorney selected incorrect judicial officer, date and time for hearing. When setting a motion for hearing there is a reminder message 'Be sure to select the correct Judge or Magistrate Judge:'. Motion is to be heard before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Clerk took corrective action.(caa, )
June 24, 2010 82 Featured Case ORDER that the telephone hearing scheduled for 6/24/2010 at 10:15 am is cancelled; FURTHER ORDER denying as premature 69 Motion to enforce preliminary injunction; FURTHER ORDER that the Court's 6/22/2010, Order is amended as stated herein; FURTHER ORDER denying 75 Motion to Stay pending appeal for the same reasons given in this Court's 6/22/2010, Order; FURTHER ORDER granting 73 Motion for disclosure of financial interests as stated herein. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/24/2010. (caa, )
June 24, 2010 81 Emergency MOTION to Intervene by Diamond Offshore Company and Diamond Offshore Management Company. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2010 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Verification, # 4 STRICKEN, see doc 91: Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibits 1-5, # 6 Exhibits 6-10, # 7 Notice of Hearing)(Baynham, Thomas) Modified on 6/24/2010 (caa, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2010: # 8 Proposed Pleading Exhibit 1, # 9 Proposed Pleading Exhibit 2 - 8, # 10 Proposed Pleading Exhibit 9, # 11 Proposed Pleading Exhibit 10 - 13) (caa, ). Modified on 6/25/2010 (car, ).
June 24, 2010 80 Featured Case ORDER granting 70 Motion to Expedite Motion to Enforce Preliminary Injunction Order. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/23/2010. (caa, )
June 24, 2010 79 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 75 MOTION to Stay re 68 Order, and 67 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary at this time.(caa, )
June 24, 2010 78 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 74 Notice of Appeal. Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary at this time.(caa, )
June 23, 2010 77 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Robert Abbey, Minerals Management Service, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior re 69 MOTION to Enforce Preliminary Injunction Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Montero, Guillermo)
June 23, 2010 76 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Defendants' Motion for Stay Pending Appeal by Robert Abbey, Minerals Management Service, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Collins, Brian)
June 23, 2010 75 MOTION to Stay re 68 Order, and 67 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Robert Abbey, Minerals Management Service, Kenneth Lee Salazar and United States Department of the Interior. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2010 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Hearing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Collins, Brian) Modified on 6/24/2010 (caa, ).
June 23, 2010 74 NOTICE OF APPEAL by All Defendants as to 68 Order,,, 67 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) (Collins, Brian)
June 23, 2010 73 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION Disclosure of Financial Interest of Court, If Any by Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Florida Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 2008 Disclosure Statement, # 2 Proposed Order)(Suttles, John)
June 23, 2010 72 TRANSCRIPT of Oral Argument held on 06/21/2010 before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. Court Reporter/Recorder Toni Tusa, Telephone number 504-589-7778. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2010. (bgh, )
June 23, 2010 71 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 70 MOTION to Expedite for Emergency Hearing. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?' before clicking the Next button. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte'.(caa, )
June 23, 2010 70 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite for Emergency Hearing by Alpha Marine Services, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C., Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Bollinger Larose LLC, Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Texas City, LP, C-Innovation, L.L.C., C-Port 2 LLC, C-Port LLC, Clean Tank, LLC, Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., Gulf Ship, L.L.C., Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Nautical Solutions LLC, Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., North American Fabricators, L.L.C., North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Reel Pipe LLC, Sea Fluids, L.L.C. and Tampa Ship, L.L.C. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rosenblum, Carl) Modified on 6/23/2010 (caa, ).
June 23, 2010 69 MOTION to Enforce Preliminary Injunction Order by Alpha Marine Services, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C., Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Bollinger Larose LLC, Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Texas City, LP, C-Innovation, L.L.C., C-Port 2 LLC, C-Port LLC, Clean Tank, LLC, Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., Gulf Ship, L.L.C., Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Nautical Solutions LLC, Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., North American Fabricators, L.L.C., North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Reel Pipe LLC, Sea Fluids, L.L.C., Tampa Ship, L.L.C.. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2010 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Notice of Hearing, # 5 Proposed Order)(Rosenblum, Carl)
June 22, 2010 68 Featured Case ORDER that Honorable Kenneth Lee "Ken" Salazar, Honorable Robert "Bob" Abbey & the Minerals Management Service, their servants, agents, successor agencies, & empls, & all persons in active concert or participation w/ them, who receive actual Ntc of this Prelim Inj & until a full trial on the merits is had, are hereby immediately prohibited from enforcing the Moratorium, entitled "Suspension of Outer Continental Shelf (OCS) Drilling of New Deepwater Wells," dated 5/28/201, & NTL No. 2010-N04 seeking implementation of the Moratorium, as applied to all drilling on the OCS in water at depths greater than 500 feet; FURTHER ORDER that dfts shall file w/ this Court & serve on plas w/in 21 days from the date of entry of this Prelim Inj a report in writing setting forth in detail the manner & form in which dfts have complied w/ the terms of the Prelim Inj. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/22/2010.(caa, )
June 22, 2010 67 Featured Case ORDER AND REASONS granting 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. An Order consistent with this opinion will be entered. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/22/2010. (caa, )
June 21, 2010 66 Amicus Brief by Bobby Jindal and Louisiana State re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (caa, )
June 21, 2010 65 Featured Case ORDER granting 52 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/21/2010. (caa, )
June 21, 2010 64 Featured Case ORDER granting 51 Motion for Leave to File the Declaration of Ford Brett into the record. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/21/2010. (caa, )
June 21, 2010 63 Featured Case ORDER granting 50 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Adam Babich for Sierra Club. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/19/2010. (caa, )
June 21, 2010 62 Featured Case ORDER granting 49 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Monica K. Reimer. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/19/2010. (caa, )
June 21, 2010 61 Featured Case ORDER granting 48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David G. Guest. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/19/2010. (caa, )
June 21, 2010 60 Featured Case ORDER granting 46 Motion for Leave to File Exhibit C to Rec. Doc. 32-2. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/19/2010. (caa, )
June 21, 2010 59 Featured Case ORDER granting 44 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Peter M. Mansfield for Robert Abbey, Minerals Management Service, Kenneth Lee Salazar and United States Department of the Interior. Attorney Sharon Denise Smith terminated. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/19/2010. (caa, )
June 21, 2010 58 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 41 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice David Guest (Fee previously paid). This is a duplicate filing of document 48 and will be noted as such. No further action is necessary. (caa, )
June 21, 2010 57 Featured Case ORDER granting 47 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Catherine Moore Wannamaker. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/21/2010. (caa, )
June 21, 2010 56 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman: Motion Hearing held on 6/21/2010 taking under submission 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C. (Court Reporter Toni Tusa.) (caa, )
June 21, 2010 55 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 53 Response/Memorandum in Support of Motion. Document was incorrectly filed as a separate document instead of an attachment to document 52 . Clerk took corrective action. No further action is needed at this time.(caa, )
June 21, 2010 54 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 52 Response to Motion. Filing attorney did not select proper filer; selected incorrect event; and did not include a Memorandum in Support or proposed order. Correct event is MOTION for Leave to File a Document. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event and adding filers. No further action required as this time. (caa, )
June 20, 2010 53 **ERROR: DOCKETED AS SEPARATE DOCUMENT** RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction amicus curiae brief. (Dart, Henry) Modified on 6/21/2010 (caa, ).
June 20, 2010 52 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Bobby Jindal and Louisiana State. (Dart, Henry) Modified on 6/21/2010 (caa, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2010: # 1 Proposed Pleading) (caa, ).
June 19, 2010 51 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Declaration of Ford Brett by Alpha Marine Services, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C., Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Bollinger Larose LLC, Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Texas City, LP, C-Innovation, L.L.C., C-Port 2 LLC, C-Port LLC, Clean Tank, LLC, Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., Gulf Ship, L.L.C., Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Nautical Solutions LLC, Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., North American Fabricators, L.L.C., North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Reel Pipe LLC, Sea Fluids, L.L.C. and Tampa Ship, L.L.C. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ford Brett, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rosenblum, Carl) Modified on 6/21/2010 (caa, ).
June 18, 2010 50 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Additional Counsel Adam Babich by Sierra Club. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Coe, Alisa)
June 18, 2010 49 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Monica Reimer (Fee previously paid) by Florida Wildlife Federation, Sierra Club. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Monica Reimer, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Coe, Alisa)
June 18, 2010 48 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice David Guest (Fee previously paid) by Florida Wildlife Federation, Sierra Club. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of David Guest, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Coe, Alisa)
June 18, 2010 47 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Catherine M. Wannamaker (Fee previously paid) by Defenders of Wildlife. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Catherine M. Wannamaker, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Suttles, John) Modified on 6/21/2010 (caa, ).
June 18, 2010 46 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit C to Record Document 33-2 by Robert Abbey, Minerals Management Service, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C to Record Doc 33-2, # 2 Proposed Order)(Collins, Brian)
June 18, 2010 45 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Florida Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11.1, # 12 Exhibit 11.2, # 13 Exhibit 12.1, # 14 Exhibit 12.2, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17)(Suttles, John)
June 18, 2010 44 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Peter Mansfield to be substituted in place of Sharon Smith by Robert Abbey, Minerals Management Service, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Sharon)
June 18, 2010 43 Intervenor COMPLAINT filed by Florida Wildlife Federation, Center for Biological Diversity, Sierra Club, Defenders of Wildlife, Natural Resources Defense Council.(gec, )
June 18, 2010 42 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr: Motion Hearing via telephone held on 6/18/2010 re 38 Motion to Expedite Hearing: GRANTED; and 37 Motion to Intervene: GRANTED, subject to the conditions stated within document. (NEF:J.Feldman) (gec, )
June 18, 2010 41 **STRICKEN AS DUPLICATE** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice David Guest (Fee previously paid) by Florida Wildlife Federation, Sierra Club. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Affadivit, # 2 Exhibit 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Coe, Alisa) Modified on 6/21/2010 (caa, ).
June 18, 2010 40 Memorandum by All Plaintiffs Addressing OCSLAs Citizen Suit Provision (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Rosenblum, Carl) Modified on 6/21/2010 (caa, ).
June 18, 2010 39 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 38 MOTION to Expedite. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion?' before clicking the Next button. Clerk modified docket text. (gec, )
June 18, 2010 38 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite by Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Florida Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Suttles, John) Modified on 6/18/2010 (gec, ).
June 18, 2010 37 MOTION to Intervene by Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Florida Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2010 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson Jr.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Michael Senatore, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Alison Granshaw, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Peter Galvin, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Frank Jackalone, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Manley Fuller, # 7 Proposed Pleading Complaint in Intervention, # 8 Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing Before Magistrate Judge Wilkinson)(Suttles, John)
June 17, 2010 36 **DEFICIENT** NOTICE by All Defendants re 33 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Errata Notice of Errata For Declaration of David J. Hayes (Dkt. #28-2))(Montero, Guillermo) Modified on 6/18/2010 (gec, ).
June 17, 2010 35 **DEFICIENT** MOTION to Intervene by Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Florida Wildlife Federation, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2010 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Michael Senatore, # 2 Exhibit 2- Declaration of Alison Chase Granshaw, # 3 Exhibit 3- Declaration of Peter Galvin, # 4 Exhibit 4- Declaration of Frank Jackalone, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Manley Fuller, # 6 Proposed Order, # 7 Proposed Pleading Responsive Pleading Per Rule 24(c), # 8 Memorandum in Support of Proposed Pleading, # 9 Proposed Order, # 10 Motion to Expedite, # 11 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Expedite, # 12 Proposed Order, # 13 Notice of Hearing)(Suttles, John) Modified on 6/18/2010 (gec, ).
June 17, 2010 34 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Monica Reimer (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 053L-2485138) by Florida Wildlife Federation, Sierra Club. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Affadivit, # 2 Exhibit 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Coe, Alisa) Modified on 6/18/2010 (gec, ).
June 17, 2010 33 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steve Black, # 2 Declaration of David J. Hayes, # 3 Declaration of Robert P. LaBelle, # 4 Declaration of Guillermo A. Montero)(Smith, Sharon) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2010: # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of David Hayes) (caa, ).
June 17, 2010 32 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice David Guest (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 053L-2485086) by Florida Wildlife Federation, Sierra Club. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Affadivit, # 2 Exhibit 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Coe, Alisa) Modified on 6/18/2010 (gec, ).
June 16, 2010 31 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Catherine M Wannamaker (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 053L-2484259) by Defenders of Wildlife. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Catherine M Wannamaker, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Suttles, John) Modified on 6/17/2010 (gec, ).
June 16, 2010 30 **DEFICIENT** MOTION to Intervene by Sierra Club, Florida Wildlife Federation, Center for Biological Diversity, Natural Resources Defense Council, Defenders of Wildlife. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Michael Senatore, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Alison Chase, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Peter Galvin, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Frank Jackalone, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Manley Fuller, # 6 Motion to Dismiss, # 7 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 8 Proposed Order, # 9 Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 10 Exhibit 1 to Opposition, # 11 Exhibit 2 to Opposition, # 12 Exhibit 3 to Opposition, # 13 Exhibit 4 to Opposition, # 14 Exhibit 5 to Opposition, # 15 Exhibit 6 to Opposition, # 16 Exhibit 7 to Opposition, # 17 Exhibit 8 to Opposition, # 18 Exhibit 9 to Opposition, # 19 Exhibit 10 to Opposition, # 20 Exhibit 11.1 to Opposition, # 21 Exhibit 11.2 to Opposition, # 22 Exhibit 12.1 to Opposition, # 23 Exhibit 12.2 to Opposition, # 24 Exhibit 13 to Opposition, # 25 Exhibit 14 to Opposition, # 26 Exhibit 15 to Opposition, # 27 Exhibit 16 to Opposition, # 28 Exhibit 17 to Opposition)(Suttles, John) Modified on 6/17/2010 (gec, ).
June 16, 2010 29 MOTION for Leave to File Affidavits and Declaration by Alpha Marine Services, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C., Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Bollinger Larose LLC, Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Texas City, LP, C-Innovation, L.L.C., C-Port 2 LLC, C-Port LLC, Clean Tank, LLC, Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., Gulf Ship, L.L.C., Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Nautical Solutions LLC, Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., North American Fabricators, L.L.C., North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Reel Pipe LLC, Sea Fluids, L.L.C., Tampa Ship, L.L.C.. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2010 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit, # 4 Affidavit, # 5 Affidavit, # 6 Affidavit, # 7 Affidavit, # 8 Affidavit, # 9 Affidavit, # 10 Memorandum in Support, # 11 Notice of Hearing, # 12 Proposed Order)(Rosenblum, Carl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2010: # 13 Declaration of Ford Brett) (caa, ).
June 16, 2010 28 **DEFICIENT** RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Robert Abbey, Minerals Management Service, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steve Black, # 2 Declaration of David J. Hayes, # 3 Declaration of Robert P. LaBelle, # 4 Declaration of Guillermo A. Montero)(Smith, Sharon) Modified on 6/17/2010 (gec, ).
June 16, 2010 27 PRE-HEARING Brief by All Plaintiffs. (Rosenblum, Carl) Modified text on 6/17/2010 (gec, ).
June 16, 2010 26 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Administrative Record by Alpha Marine Services, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C., Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Bollinger Larose LLC, Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Texas City, LP, C-Innovation, L.L.C., C-Port 2 LLC, C-Port LLC, Clean Tank, LLC, Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., Gulf Ship, L.L.C., Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Nautical Solutions LLC, Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., North American Fabricators, L.L.C., North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Reel Pipe LLC, Sea Fluids, L.L.C., Tampa Ship, L.L.C.. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2010 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Notice of Hearing, # 4 Proposed Order)(Rosenblum, Carl)
June 14, 2010 25 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John F. Cooney. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/14/2010. (caa, )
June 14, 2010 24 **DEFICIENT** NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M Collins on behalf of All Defendants. (Collins, Brian) Modified on 6/15/2010 (caa, ).
June 14, 2010 23 Featured Case ORDER denying 15 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/14/2010. (caa, )
June 14, 2010 22 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/14/2010. (caa, )
June 14, 2010 21 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 17 Response to Motion. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event.(caa, )
June 14, 2010 20 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 16 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Hearing re 15 MOTION to Continue the June 21, 2010 Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Not necessary to select relief MOTION for Hearing for this document. Only the relief MOTION to Expedite is necessary. Clerk modified docket text. No further action is necessary at this time. (caa, )
June 14, 2010 19 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 14 MOTION to Continue the June 21, 2010 Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction. This is a duplicate filing of document 15 and will be noted as such. No further action is necessary.(caa, )
June 14, 2010 18 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 14 MOTION to Continue the June 21, 2010 Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filing attorney should have selected 'No' at the question 'Is this an ExParte/Consent motion?'. Motions set for hearing or NOT Exparte/Consent motions. Clerk modified docket text to remove 'Exparte/Consent'. (caa, )
June 12, 2010 17 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re 15 MOTION to Continue the June 21, 2010 Preliminary Injunction Hearing and 16 MOTION to Expedite. (Rosenblum, Carl) Modified on 6/14/2010 (caa, ).
June 11, 2010 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Sharon) Modified on 6/14/2010 (caa, ). Modified on 6/14/2010 (caa, ).
June 11, 2010 15 MOTION to Continue the June 21, 2010 Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Robert Abbey, Minerals Management Service, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2010 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Notice of Hearing)(Smith, Sharon)
June 11, 2010 14 **STRICKEN AS DUPLICATE** MOTION to Continue the June 21, 2010 Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Robert Abbey, Minerals Management Service, Kenneth Lee Salazar and United States Department of the Interior. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2010 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Motion for Expedited Hearing, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Notice of Hearing)(Smith, Sharon) Modified on 6/14/2010 (caa, ).
June 11, 2010 13 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John F. Cooney, (Fee previously paid). Filing fee is DUE and Multiple PDF's were incorrectly filed as one. The Affidavit and Certificate should have been filed as attachment(s) to MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. All future filings should be entered this way. Clerk took corrective action. Please use the event under Other Documents - Filing Fee Payment - Appear Pro Hac Vice and use a credit card to pay this fee. In the future, this fee should be paid when the motion is filed. (caa, )
June 11, 2010 12 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion for Joinder as to Hornbeck's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/11/2010. (caa, )
June 11, 2010 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John F. Cooney, (Fee previously paid - Fee Paid 6/11/2010) by Alpha Marine Services, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C., Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Bollinger Larose LLC, Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Texas City, LP, C-Innovation, L.L.C., C-Port 2 LLC, C-Port LLC, Clean Tank, LLC, Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., Gulf Ship, L.L.C., Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Minerals Management Service, Nautical Solutions LLC, Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., North American Fabricators, L.L.C., North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Reel Pipe LLC, Kenneth Lee Salazar, Sea Fluids, L.L.C., Tampa Ship, L.L.C. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosenblum, Carl) (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/11/2010) (caa, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2010: # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Certificate) (caa, ). Modified on 6/14/2010 (caa, ).
June 11, 2010 10 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 MOTION to Expedite filed by Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C., Resetting Hearing on 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for 6/21/2010 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/11/2010.(caa, )
June 9, 2010 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Joinder as to Hornbeck's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Alpha Marine Services, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C., Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Bollinger Larose LLC, Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Texas City, LP, C-Innovation, L.L.C., C-Port 2 LLC, C-Port LLC, Clean Tank, LLC, Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., Gulf Ship, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Nautical Solutions LLC, Nautical Ventures, L.L.C., North American Fabricators, L.L.C., North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Reel Pipe LLC, Sea Fluids, L.L.C. and Tampa Ship, L.L.C. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(caa, )
June 9, 2010 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injuction by Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(caa, )
June 9, 2010 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2010 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - J, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Notice of Hearing)(caa, )
June 9, 2010 6 Summons Issued as to Robert Abbey, Minerals Management Service, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior, United States Attorney, EDLA and United States Attorney General. (caa, )
June 9, 2010 5 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robert Abbey, Minerals Management Service, Kenneth Lee Salazar and United States Department of the Interior filed by Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C. Bee Mar - Worker Bee LLC, North American Fabricators, L.L.C., Bee Mar LLC, Offshore Support Services, L.L.C., Martin Holdings, LLC, Bollinger Algiers, L.L.C., Sea Fluids, L.L.C., Bollinger Marine Fabricators, Inc., C-Port 2 LLC, Bee Mar - Bayou Bee LLC, Bollinger Amelia Repair, LLC, C-Port LLC, Fourchon Heavy Lift, L.L.C., C-Innovation, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bee Hive LLC, Bee Mar - Queen Bee LLC, Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Clean Tank, LLC, Bee Mar - Honey Bee LLC, Tampa Ship, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Busy Bee LLC, Bee Mar Crews LLC, Bee Mar - Bumble Bee LLC, Bollinger Texas City, LP, Bollinger Calcasieu, LLC, Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C., Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C., Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C., Bollinger Gretna, L.L.C., Bee Mar - Bee Sting LLC, Bollinger Larose LLC, North American Shipbuilding, L.L.C., Bollinger Fourchon, L.L.C. and Gulf Ship, L.L.C. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 4, # 2 Verification (Hornbeck), # 3 Verification (Chouest), # 4 Verification (Bollinger))(caa, )
June 8, 2010 4 Featured Case ORDER denying 3 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/8/2010. (caa, )
June 8, 2010 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for memorandum in support of motion for preliminary injunction by Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C. (caa, )
June 8, 2010 2 Summons Issued as to Robert Abbey, Minerals Management Service, Kenneth Lee Salazar, United States Department of the Interior, United States Attorney General and United States Attorney, EDLA. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(caa, )
June 7, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Abbey, Minerals Management Service, Kenneth Lee Salazar and United States Department of the Interior (Filing fee $ 350) filed by Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C. (Attachments: # 1 Verification, # 2 Exhibit 1 - 4, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(caa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C. v. Salazar et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hornbeck Offshore Services, L.L.C.
Represented By: Alida C. Hainkel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Lee Salazar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Abbey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minerals Management Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]