C-Innovation, LLC v. Norddeutsche Seekabelwerke GmbH

Defendant: Norddeutsche Seekabelwerke GmbH
Plaintiff: C-Innovation, LLC
Case Number: 2:2010cv04441
Filed: December 1, 2010
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Alma L. Chasez
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2012 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 125 Motion for Hearing for Pre-Trial Evidentiary Hearing Regarding Personal Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 12/28/2012. (caa, )
March 13, 2013 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part NSW's 94 Motion to Dismiss, as stated herein. FURTHER ORDER that NSW shall file an answer to C-Innovation's amended complaint with respect to the purchase of cables no later than MARCH 22, 2013 at 5:00 P.M. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/13/2013. (tsf)
March 13, 2013 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying NSW's 127 Motion for Summary Judgment, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/13/2013. (tsf)
November 3, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS. ORDERED that 9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is DENIED. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 11/1/2011. (clm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C-Innovation, LLC v. Norddeutsche Seekabelwerke GmbH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norddeutsche Seekabelwerke GmbH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C-Innovation, LLC
Represented By: Wade P. Webster
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]