Brown v. Wimberly et al

Plaintiff: William E Brown
Defendant: Jesse L Wimberly, III and Unidentified Parties
Case Number: 2:2011cv01169
Filed: May 16, 2011
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Martin L.C. Feldman
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 16 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/19/2011. (tsf, ) Modified on 10/20/2011 (tsf, ).
November 7, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 9 Request/Statement of Oral Argument and 18 Request/Statement of Oral Argument filed by Jesse L Wimberly, III and 32 Request/Statement of Oral Argument filed by Hector R. Lopez. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/7/2011. (tsf, )
November 9, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting 17 Motion to Strike 1 Complaint and 31 Motion to Dismiss Hector R. Lopez. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/9/2011. (tsf, ) Modified on 11/9/2011 (tsf, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Wimberly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse L Wimberly, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.