New York Life Insurance and Annuity Corporation v. Cannatella et al

Plaintiff: New York Life Insurance and Annuity Corporation
Defendant: Cynthia Dufour Cannatella and Diane Perez Cannatella
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01431
Filed: June 17, 2011
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Kurt D. Engelhardt
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that the prior Order of this Court 18 denying New York Life Insurance and Annuity Corporation's Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of New York Life Insurance and Annuity Corporation's Motions for I njunctive Relief, Declaratory Judgment and Dismissal with Prejudice 17 is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that New York Life Insurance and Annuity Corporation's Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of New York Life Insurance and Annuity Corporation's Motions for Injunctive Relief, Declaratory Judgment and Dismissal with Prejudice 17 is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 9/30/2011.(cab) Modified on 10/3/2011 to edit document type (cab).
February 8, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that the "Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs" 19 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. New York Life is entitled to a $750 attorney's fee for having to respond to Diane Cannatella's opposition to its Motion to Dismiss, for Injunctive Relief, and for Declaratory Judgment. This sum is payable within 60 days and will earn legal interest thereafter. New York Life is not entitled to any additional attorney's fees or costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Diane Cannatella pay this $750 attorney's fee to New York Life within 60 days of the issuance of this order as stated within document. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 2/7/2012. (cab) (NEF: Financial)
February 16, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that the "Motion for Summary Judgment" 20 is DENIED as stated within document. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 2/16/2012. (cab)
June 7, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that the "Motion for Summary Judgment" 38 is GRANTED. The Policy proceeds currently in the Court's Registry are awarded to Cynthia Cannatella as stated within document. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 6/7/2012. (cab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: New York Life Insurance and Annuity Corporation v. Cannatella et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Life Insurance and Annuity Corporation
Represented By: Thomas H. Peyton
Represented By: Maura Zivalich Pelleteri
Represented By: Amy S. Malish
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Dufour Cannatella
Represented By: Frederick E. Yorsch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Perez Cannatella
Represented By: Raymond Charles Burkart, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]