Alphonse v. Arch Bay Holdings, LLC et al

Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Arch Bay Holdings, LLC and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Plaintiff: Glenn E. Alphonse, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2012cv00330
Filed: February 1, 2012
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St Tammany
Presiding Judge: Helen G. Berrigan
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that 77 MOTION to Quash or Modify, or in the Alternative, MOTION for Protective Order Regarding the Deposition of Dean Morris, LLP and 80 MOTION to Quash or Modify, or in the Alternative, MOTION for Protective Order Regarding the Depositio n of Dean Morris, LLP by Dean Morris LLP are DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff, Glen Alphonse, Jr. may retrieve the documents on Wednesday, 8/27/2014 from the undersigned United States Magistrate Judges Chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 8/19/2014. (cml)
September 24, 2014 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS that the stay previously imposed is PARTIALLY LIFTED as follows: Each of the defendants shall file a statement containing all information relevant to their citizenship no later than October 8, 2014. The parties shall file any supplemental memoranda directed to the issue of subject matter jurisdiction at that time. The parties shall meet with Magistrate Judge Roby for settlement discussions. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 9/24/2014. [NEF: KWR](kac)
November 24, 2014 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and REASONS that the remaining claims are DISMISSED without prejudice under 28:1367(c). The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over those claims. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 11/24/14.(plh) Modified doc type on 11/24/2014 (plh).
July 30, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss and 15 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Pla is given until 8/13/2012 to amend his complaint. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 07/30/2012. (kac, )
January 3, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting 38 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 01/02/2013. (kac, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alphonse v. Arch Bay Holdings, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Heather A. LaSalle
Represented By: Eric J. Simonson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Bay Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Eric J. Simonson
Represented By: Heather A. LaSalle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn E. Alphonse, Jr.
Represented By: Marc R. Michaud
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]