United States of America v. Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C. and Halter Bollinger Joint Venture, LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv00920
Filed: April 11, 2012
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Lafourche
Referring Judge: Alma L. Chasez
Presiding Judge: Sarah S. Vance
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2013 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 73 Motion for Reconsideration of this Court's order of January 30, 2013. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/1/13. (jjs, )
October 21, 2013 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting 83 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/21/13. (jjs, )
April 13, 2015 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting 143 the government's motion for review of the Magistrate Judge's August 28, 2013 order is GRANTED. The Magistrate Judge's order is hereby vacated, but the government is ordered to pay Bollinger's attorneys' fees and costs in an amount to be determined hereafter.. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/13/15.(jjs)
January 30, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting 27 Motion to Dismiss Case. Plaintiff's negligent misrepresentation and unjust enrichment claims are dismissed with prejudice, and the United States is granted leave to amend its False Claims Act and fraud claims within 20 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/30/13. (jjs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Bollinger Shipyards, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Arnold M. Auerhan
Represented By: Sharon Denise Smith
Represented By: David B. Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bollinger Shipyards, Inc.
Represented By: Jon W. Burd
Represented By: C. Berwick Duval, II
Represented By: Stanwood R. Duval
Represented By: Scott M. McCaleb
Represented By: Kara M. Sacilotto
Represented By: Marcus B. Slater, Jr.
Represented By: Mark B. Sweet
Represented By: Roderick L. Thomas
Represented By: Jennifer J. Zeien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jon W. Burd
Represented By: C. Berwick Duval, II
Represented By: Stanwood R. Duval
Represented By: Scott M. McCaleb
Represented By: Kara M. Sacilotto
Represented By: Marcus B. Slater, Jr.
Represented By: Mark B. Sweet
Represented By: Roderick L. Thomas
Represented By: Jennifer J. Zeien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halter Bollinger Joint Venture, LLC
Represented By: Jon W. Burd
Represented By: C. Berwick Duval, II
Represented By: Stanwood R. Duval
Represented By: Scott M. McCaleb
Represented By: Kara M. Sacilotto
Represented By: Marcus B. Slater, Jr.
Represented By: Mark B. Sweet
Represented By: Roderick L. Thomas
Represented By: Jennifer J. Zeien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.