Hamilton et al v. Ochsner Health Systems, Inc.

Plaintiff: Curtis Hamilton and Rosa Hamilton
Defendant: Ochsner Health Systems, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01398
Filed: June 1, 2012
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Sally Shushan
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2012 29 Featured Case ORDER & REASONS re dft's 14 Motion in Limine: for the reasons stated, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion in Limine is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any evidence or reference to Hamilton's decubit us ulcers is excluded, unless Plaintiffs can later show the relevance of this evidence to their claims, and so Defendant's motion is granted on that issue. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any evidence of the X-ray and the alleged failure of the radiologist to diagnose a fracture may be presented to the jury at trial, and therefore Defendant's motion is denied on that issue. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/10/2012. (rll, ) Modified on 12/10/2012 to edit doc type (rll, ).
December 11, 2012 30 Featured Case ORDER & REASONS re plas' 27 Motion in Limine Relative to Exclusion of Testimony by Jane Eason: for the reasons stated, plas' Motion in Limine is DENIED. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/11/2012. (rll, ) Modified on 12/11/2012 to edit doc type (rll, ).
December 27, 2012 52 Featured Case ORDER & REASONS re dft's 33 Motion to Quash and for Protective Order: For the reasons stated, the Court finds Plas' subpoena is untimely and places an undue and prejudicial burden on Defendant, while not providing good cause why the docum ents could not have been requested earlier. As such, the Court will grant the pending motion to quash the subpoena. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Dft's Motion to Quash and For Protective Order is GRANTED and the subpoena is quashed in its entirety. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/27/2012. (rll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hamilton et al v. Ochsner Health Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Hamilton
Represented By: Jimmie Simien
Represented By: Eulis Simien, Jr.
Represented By: Mark W. Simien
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Hamilton
Represented By: Eulis Simien, Jr.
Represented By: Jimmie Simien
Represented By: Mark W. Simien
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ochsner Health Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]