Snow Ingredients, Inc. et al v. SnoWizard, Inc.

Plaintiff: Snow Ingredients, Inc. and Simeon, Inc.
Defendant: SnoWizard, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv01412
Filed: June 1, 2012
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Plaquemines
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Sally Shushan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 66 Third Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs' Counsel Pursuant to Rule 11. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/21/2014. (my)
March 27, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting 62 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/27/2014. (my)
March 28, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 67 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (jrc)
March 31, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 76 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDERED that Plaintiffs are to notify the Court by Tuesday, April 14, 2015 if Raggs and Special T intend to pursue their claims in this litigation. If Plaintiffs do not r espond by that date, the Court will assume that Defendants are correct, and the issue is moot. If Plaintiffs assert that they do intend to pursue claims, and Defendants believe they are precluded, Defendants are to file responsive briefing by Tuesday, April 21, 2015. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (jrc)
April 17, 2015 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 81 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice the Reinstated Claims in 12-1412 Under Rule 41(a)(2). Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 4/16/15. (jrc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snow Ingredients, Inc. et al v. SnoWizard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Snow Ingredients, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Edw. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simeon, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Edw. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SnoWizard, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Edward Morris
Represented By: Kenneth L. Tolar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]