Global Oil Tools, Inc. v. Barnhill et al

Defendant: Diane Barnhill, Denise LeBlanc, Daniel Triche, Downhole-Surface Manufacturing, LLC, Barnhill Industries, Inc., Wilfred J. Barnhill and Brian A. Barnhill
Plaintiff: Global Oil Tools, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01507
Filed: June 13, 2012
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Terrebonne
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2012 108 Featured Case ORDER & REASONS: granting in part and denying in part 21 Defendants Wilfred Barnhill, Brian Barnhill, Diane Barnhill, Downhole-Surface Manufacturing, LLC, and Barnhill Industries Inc's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6); granting in part and denying in part 22 Defendants Denise Leblanc and Daniel Triche's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 11/19/12. (sek, )
November 30, 2012 113 Featured Case ORDER granting 46 Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (clm, )
December 3, 2012 114 Featured Case ORDERED that 31 Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed to Whitney Bank of New Orleans is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 68 Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed to Whitney Bank of Gulfport Mississippi is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 99 Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed to Commerce Bank is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (clm, )
December 4, 2012 115 Featured Case ORDER granting 47 Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 12/3/2012. (clm, )
February 22, 2013 141 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 125 Motion to Quash, as stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 2/22/2013. (Reference: 12-1507)(caa, )
April 3, 2013 161 Featured Case ORDERED that 140 Motion to Compel Production of Documents is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Global Oil Tools, Inc shall produce Report as stated within document no later than seven days of the issuance of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (Reference: 12-1507)(clm, )
May 14, 2013 168 Featured Case ORDER denying 149 MOTION for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 5/14/13. (Reference: 12-1507)(sek, )
June 17, 2013 172 Featured Case ORDER & REASONS: granting in part and denying in part 145 Consolidated Defendants' Motion to Dismiss as set forth in document. The Barnhills are GRANTED leave to amend their pleadings in accordance with this Order. The Barnhills must submi t an amended complaint to this Court within twenty-one (21) days of entry of this Order. Failure to amend within the required period will result in certain dismissals re case 12-1507 and case 12-3041 as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/14/13. (Reference: 12-1507, 12-3041)(sek, )
June 17, 2013 173 Featured Case ORDER & REASONS: ORDERED that Counts III and IV of case No. 12-3041 are SEVERED and REMANDED back to the 32nd Judicial District for the Parish of Terrebonne, Louisiana. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/14/13.(Reference: 12-3041)(sek, ) Modified on 6/17/2013 - (cc order & remand letter to 32nd JDC) (sek, ).
September 23, 2013 193 Featured Case ORDER & REASONS: granting in part and denying in part 176 Motion to Dismiss; ORDERED that Counts I, II, and V of the Counterplaintiff's claim in 12-1507 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/23/13. (Reference: 12-1507)(sek, )
October 16, 2012 91 Featured Case ORDER & REASONS denying 35 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 10/16/12. (sek, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Global Oil Tools, Inc. v. Barnhill et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Barnhill
Represented By: Frederic C. Fondren
Represented By: Patrick S. McGoey
Represented By: Kyle D. Schonekas
Represented By: Andrea V. Timpa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise LeBlanc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Triche
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Downhole-Surface Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Frederic C. Fondren
Represented By: Patrick S. McGoey
Represented By: Kyle D. Schonekas
Represented By: Andrea V. Timpa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnhill Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Frederic C. Fondren
Represented By: Patrick S. McGoey
Represented By: Kyle D. Schonekas
Represented By: Andrea V. Timpa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilfred J. Barnhill
Represented By: Andrea V. Timpa
Represented By: Kyle D. Schonekas
Represented By: Patrick S. McGoey
Represented By: Frederic C. Fondren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian A. Barnhill
Represented By: Patrick S. McGoey
Represented By: Frederic C. Fondren
Represented By: Kyle D. Schonekas
Represented By: Andrea V. Timpa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Oil Tools, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Reese Davis
Represented By: Tim P. Hartdegen
Represented By: L. J. Hymel, Jr.
Represented By: Glen Richard Petersen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]