Judeh v. Louisiana State University System et al

Plaintiff: Hilmi Judeh
Defendant: Louisiana State University System, Louisiana State University Health Sciences Center, Elizabeth Fontham, Stephanie Tortu, Donna Williams, Ariane Rung and Joseph Moerschbaecher
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01758
Filed: July 5, 2012
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Presiding Judge: Sarah S. Vance
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER denying 31 Motion to Recover Costs and Expenses for Service of Process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 2/20/2013. (caa, )
April 18, 2013 48 Featured Case ORDER AND REASONS - the Court GRANTS in its entirety the motion 13 to dismiss the Louisiana State University Health Sciences Center, the Louisiana State University System, and Ariane Rung. The Court GRANTS the motion 25 of Stephanie Tortu as to p laintiff's claims against Tortu in her official capacity and plaintiff's claims under the First Amendment but DENIES the motion as to plaintiff's due process claims. The Court GRANTS the motion 20 of Donna Williams, Elizabeth Fontham , and Joseph Moerschbaecher as to plaintiff's claims against defendants in their official capacity, plaintiff's First Amendment claims, and the due process claims against Elizabeth Fontham and Joseph Moerschbaecher. The Court, however, DENIES the motion as to plaintiff's claims against Williams for violation of due process.. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/18/13. (jjs, )
October 10, 2013 60 Featured Case ORDER AND REASONS - the Court GRANTS the defendants'motion for summary judgment.. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/10/13.(jjs, )
December 30, 2013 67 Featured Case ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendants have 14 days from the date of this order to request anew amount reflecting only recoverable fees. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 12/30/2013. (mmm)
January 14, 2014 70 Featured Case ORDER CLARIFYING 67 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendants have an additional ten days to amend their fee request to eliminate any fees incurred in the defense of plaintiff's due process claim.. Signed by Chief Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/14/14.(jjs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Judeh v. Louisiana State University System et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilmi Judeh
Represented By: Nicholas Stephen Lindner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State University System
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State University Health Sciences Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Fontham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Tortu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ariane Rung
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Moerschbaecher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]