Adventure Harbor Estates, LLC et al v. LeBlanc et al

Defendant: Michael A. LeBlanc and Mary Kaye LeBlanc
Petitioner: Steven Serafin
Plaintiff: William McCollough and Adventure Harbor Estates, LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01848
Filed: July 13, 2012
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Terrebonne
Referring Judge: Alma L. Chasez
Presiding Judge: Jay C. Zainey
 
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2012 15 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion to Disqualify Counsel Randall Mark Alfred. Mr. Alfred to notify defendants and inform Clerk of defendants' mailing address. Plaintiffs to move to amend complaint within 10 days. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 11/8/12. (jrc, )
April 9, 2014 190 Featured Case ORDER denying 161 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (Reference: 12-2848, 13-142, 13-4925)(jrc)
July 31, 2014 223 Featured Case ORDER granting 208 Motion for Summary Judgment; The claims asserted by Michael A. LeBlanc and Mary Kaye LeBlanc against Steve Serafin and William McCollough are DISMISSED with prejudice; FURTHER ORDERED that the status conference set for September 24, 2014, is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (Reference: 13-4925)(jrc)
August 14, 2014 230 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 209 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 210 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 8/13/14. (Reference: 12-1848, 13-142, 13-4925)(jrc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Adventure Harbor Estates, LLC et al v. LeBlanc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. LeBlanc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Kaye LeBlanc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Serafin
Represented By: Paul C. Miniclier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William McCollough
Represented By: Paul C. Miniclier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adventure Harbor Estates, LLC
Represented By: Paul C. Miniclier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]