Morshaeuser et al v. Citimortgage, Inc. et al

Defendant: Jackson & McPherson, LLC, Citimortgage, Inc. and Anne Raymond
Plaintiff: Andrea Morshaeuser and Paul James Casey Fos
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02210
Filed: September 5, 2012
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St Tammany
Presiding Judge: Martin L.C. Feldman
Referring Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Paul James Casey Fos and Andrea Morshaeuser; granting 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Anne Raymond and Jackson & McPherson, LLC; and Resetting Hearing on 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for 11/7/2012, on the papers, after submission of supplemental papers no later than 10/31/2012. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/24/2012.(caa, )
November 14, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as stated herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs request for leave to amend their state court petition is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/14/2012. (caa, )
January 9, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS denying 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 1/9/2013. (caa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Morshaeuser et al v. Citimortgage, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson & McPherson, LLC
Represented By: David J. Ayo
Represented By: James H. Gibson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citimortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Monique M. Lafontaine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Raymond
Represented By: James H. Gibson
Represented By: David J. Ayo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Morshaeuser
Represented By: Paul James Casey Fos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul James Casey Fos
Represented By: Paul James Casey Fos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]