Nola Spice Designs, LLC v. Haydel Enterprises, Inc.

Defendant: Haydel Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nola Spice Designs, LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv02515
Filed: October 16, 2012
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS granting Nola Spice Designs, LLC and Raquel Duarte's 80 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 8/12/2013. (gbw, )
August 28, 2013 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS: ORDERED THAT Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Nola Spice, LLC and Third Party Defendant Raquel Duarte's Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 60 ) is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that a declaratory jud gment stating that Nola Spice Designs, LLC is not infringing on the trademarks of Haydel Enterprises d/b/a/ Haydel's Bakery be entered. FURTHER ORDERED that Nola Spice Design, LLC's claims under the Louisiana Unfair Trade Practices Act, La. R.S. 51:1405 et seq., be DISMISSED with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff Haydel Enterprises' Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 85 ) is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Haydel Enterprises' counterclaims against Nol a Spice Designs, LLC and Raquel Duarte for copyright infringement in violation of 17 U.S.C 106, false designation of origin in violation of the Lanham Act, trademark infringement in violation of the Lanham Act, trademark dilution in violation of the Lanham Act and Louisiana's Anti-Dilution Act, and unfair trade practices under LUTPA be DISMISSED with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Haydel Enterprise's Motion to Strike (Rec. Doc. 97 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 8/28/13. (sek, )
September 20, 2013 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that Nola Spice Design, LLC's 114 Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (gec, )
November 20, 2013 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS: denying 134 Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment Without Supersedeas Bond and, in the Alternative, to Reduce Amount of Supersedeas Bond (Rec. Doc. 134 ) is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that, if Haydel wishes to stay the enforcement of this judgment, it must post a supersedeas bond in the amount of the judgment plus twenty (20) per cent, which amounts to $37,205.58, within ten (10) days of this order. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 11/20/13. (sek, )
August 2, 2013 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 73 MOTION to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/2/2013.(blg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nola Spice Designs, LLC v. Haydel Enterprises, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haydel Enterprises, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nola Spice Designs, LLC
Represented By: Jason Paul Foote
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]