Wells v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: McReynold Wells
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00120
Filed: January 23, 2013
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Tangipahoa
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2013 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendant's 43 Motion in Limine, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 11/6/2013. (tsf)
November 12, 2013 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 72 Motion to Exclude. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (cbn)
November 13, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defendant's 45 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 11/12/2013. (tsf)
November 14, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying Plaintiff's 74 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Defendant's 80 Motion for Summary Judgment, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 11/14/2013. (tsf)
May 10, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that 15 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint is GRANTED AS UNOPPOSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (clm, )
June 20, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that 23 Motion to Vacate Deposition Notices and Motion to Quash Subpoena/Subpoenas Duces Tecum is DENIED. It is DENIED as to Wells' request for reasonable attorney's fees and costs. FURTHER ORDERED that dates of each subpoena duces tecum directed at Rawndy Wells Wagner, and Wanda Michael Wells is CONTINUED until 6/7/2013, as stated at oral argument. The substance of each subpoena duces tecum remains unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (clm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wells v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Henry Gerard Terhoeve
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McReynold Wells
Represented By: Erica D. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]