Dowdle v. MSE Construction et al

Defendant: MSE Building Co., Inc., Gary Cofer, MSE Construction and Unidentified Party
Plaintiff: Anthony Dowdle
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00498
Filed: March 20, 2013
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Helen G. Berrigan
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 89 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 07/21/2014. (kac)
June 24, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. IT IS FURTHER that all claims against defendant Gary Cofer are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 06/24/2013. (kac, )
July 2, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS ON MOTION. Defendant's Motion to Hold Plaintiff in Contempt of Court, Record Doc. No. 85, is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, subject to the order contained herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 7/2/14. (tbl) [NEF: Hon. Helen G. Berrigan]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dowdle v. MSE Construction et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSE Building Co., Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Cofer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSE Construction
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Dowdle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]