Greater New Orleans Fair Housing Action Center, Inc. et al v. Ditta

Plaintiff: Greater New Orleans Fair Housing Action Center, Inc. and Kawana Clark
Defendant: Gerald Ditta
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00511
Filed: March 19, 2013
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS ON MOTIONS re (1) Plaintiffs' 19 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and for a Protective Order and (2) Defendant's 21 Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Recordings and Narratives of Defendant's Own Stateme nts. For the reasons stated herein, IT IS ORDERED that defendant's motion is GRANTED, and plaintiffs' motion is DENIED IN SUBSTANTIAL PART AND GRANTED IN LIMITED PART in that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(2), the discovery that is the subject of these motions must proceed as set forth herein. Under this odd circumstance, IT IS ORDERED that, if defendant seeks sanctions in connection with these motions, he must file a new motion, noticed for submission under Local Rule 7.2 and set ting out the amount sought and the reasons for any such request, supported by his counsel's affidavit(s) and in the manner required by Local Rule 54.2. Otherwise, no sanctions will be awarded.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 10/28/13. (tbl)
November 22, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS ON MOTION. Defendant's Motion for Reasonable Attorney Fees Under Rule 37(a)(5) Incurred in Connection with Plaintiff's Improper Withholding of Defendants Statements, Record Doc. No. 38, is GRANTED. For the foregoing reasons, plaintiffs must pay defendant $5,865.00 to reimburse defendant for reasonable fees incurred in connection with the underlying motions. Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 11/22/13. (tbl)
December 2, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Motion and Stipulation to Dismiss Certain Claims against defendant as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 11/27/2013. (lag, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Greater New Orleans Fair Housing Action Center, Inc. et al v. Ditta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater New Orleans Fair Housing Action Center, Inc.
Represented By: Cashauna Hill
Represented By: Elizabeth Joanne Owen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kawana Clark
Represented By: Cashauna Hill
Represented By: Elizabeth Joanne Owen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Ditta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]