Drago v. Sykes et al

Plaintiff: David A Drago
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00563
Filed: March 27, 2013
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Kurt D. Engelhardt
Referring Judge: Sally Shushan
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER and REASONS denying 4 Motion to Remand to State Court, as stated within document. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 7/19/2013. (cbs)
December 17, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER and REASONS granting 14 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claim for Bad Faith for Allegedly Failing to Tender UM Benefits, as stated within document. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 12/17/2013. (cbs)
January 23, 2014 63 Featured Case ORDER and REASONS - Before the Court is a second motion to remand filed by the plaintiff 54 . IT IS ORDERED that: 1) Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Rec. Doc. 54) is hereby DENIED; and 2) State Farm's request for sanctions is DENIED, as stated within document. Signed by Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt on 1/23/2014. (cbs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Drago v. Sykes et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A Drago
Represented By: Keith Andrew Conley
Represented By: Michael S. Brandner, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: David V. Batt
Represented By: Charles Robert Rumbley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]