Lee et al v. Pearl River Basin Land and Development Company, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jennifer Elizabeth Lee and Craig Lee
Defendant: Pearl River Basin Land & Development Company, LLC, Pearl River Town and Unidentified Parties
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00590
Filed: April 1, 2013
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St Tammany
Presiding Judge: Martin L.C. Feldman
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
 
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2014 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS granting 32 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying as moot 98 Motion for Extension of Deadlines; denying 72 Motion to Dismiss Case; granting 67 Motion for Extension of Deadlines; denying 100 Motion to Strike and granting 100 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/14/2014. (caa)
February 11, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that 25 Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED. The Court finds that a total amount of $697.50 in fees is reasonable in the matter here. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall satisfy his obligation to Pearl River no later than twenty (20) days from the issuance of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 2/10/2014. (cml, )
March 14, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that 35 Motion to Quash Depositions is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cml)
April 2, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS denying 36 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 4/2/2014. (caa)
April 30, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and REASONS denying 57 MOTION for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court and the magistrate judge's 3/14/2014 Order is AFFIRMED. FURTHER ORDER that, not later than 5/7/2014, counsel for plaintiffs must certify in the record that they have provided their clients a copy of this Order and Reasons. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 4/30/2014. (caa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lee et al v. Pearl River Basin Land and Development Company, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Elizabeth Lee
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Represented By: Richard Hobbs Barker, IV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Lee
Represented By: Richard Hobbs Barker, IV
Represented By: Jack W. Harang
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearl River Basin Land & Development Company, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearl River Town
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]