Phillips et al v. ABB Combustion Engineering, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Robert Lee Phillips and Carol Phillips
Defendant: ABB Combustion Engineering, Inc., Centerpoint Energy, Inc., Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc., Nebraska Public Power District and Grand Island City
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00594
Filed: April 2, 2013
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St John the Baptist
Presiding Judge: Martin L.C. Feldman
Referring Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
 
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS granting 20 & 21 Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Parties Grand Island City & Nebraska Public Power District dismissed. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/17/2013. (caa, )
June 19, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS denying 22 Motion for More Definite Statement and granting 22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Party Robert Lee Phillips (Estate of ) dismissed. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/19/2013. (caa, )
October 23, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS denying without prejudice 67 and 69 Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/23/2013. (caa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Phillips et al v. ABB Combustion Engineering, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Phillips
Represented By: Leandre Michael Millet, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Phillips
Represented By: Leandre Michael Millet, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB Combustion Engineering, Inc.
Represented By: Larry Gene Canada
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerpoint Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Winstol D. Carter, Jr.
Represented By: Brady Sherrod Edwards
Represented By: Alexandra L. Farias
Represented By: Denise U Scofield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Electric Cooperative, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Edward Guidry
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: Lee Blanton Ziffer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Public Power District
Represented By: Roy Clifton Cheatwood
Represented By: Paul Kevin Colomb, Jr.
Represented By: Robert S. Emmett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Island City
Represented By: Roy Clifton Cheatwood
Represented By: Paul Kevin Colomb, Jr.
Represented By: Robert S. Emmett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]