Cedar Ridge, LLC v. Landmark American Insurance Company et al

Defendant: RSUI Indemnity Company and Landmark American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Cedar Ridge, LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00672
Filed: April 10, 2013
 
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St Tammany
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2014 117 Featured Case ORDER AND REASONS granting defendants' 102 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying plaintiff's 104 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 3/5/2014. (blg)
March 7, 2014 118 Featured Case ORDER AND REASONS denying 103 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 3/7/2014. (blg)
September 10, 2013 30 Featured Case ORDERED that 17 Motion for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (clm, )
December 6, 2013 72 Featured Case ORDERED that 51 Motion for Protective Order to Limit Scope of Rule30(b)(6)Deposition and Accompanying Request for Production of Documents is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (clm, )
January 8, 2014 89 Featured Case ORDERED that 56 Motion for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amending Third Party Complaint is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cml, )
January 27, 2014 93 Featured Case ORDER granting 80 Motion for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that Landmark's third-party complaint against Roof Tech is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED that Landmark's first supplemental and amending third-party complaint against National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/27/2014. (blg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cedar Ridge, LLC v. Landmark American Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSUI Indemnity Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark American Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedar Ridge, LLC
Represented By: Joseph M. Bruno
Represented By: Daniel A. Meyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]