Brennan et al v. Brennan et al
Plaintiff: |
Brennan's, Inc., Bridget Brennan Tyrrell and Theodore Brennan |
Defendant: |
Bert Clark Brennan, Blake W Brennan and Owen E Brennan, Jr |
Counter_claimant: |
Bert Clark Brennan, Owen E Brennan, Jr and Blake W Brennan |
Counter_defendant: |
Theodore Brennan, Bridget Brennan Tyrrell and Brennan's, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv02491 |
Filed: |
April 29, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana |
Office: |
New Orleans Office |
County: |
Orleans |
Presiding Judge: |
Susie Morgan |
Presiding Judge: |
Sally Shushan |
Nature of Suit: |
Stockholders Suits |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 13, 2013 |
Filing
113
ORDER denying for lack of jurisdiction 95 Motion to Disqualify Stone Pigman as Counsel. FURTHER ORDER that all other relief sought by defendants in theirmotion to disqualify, including the request for attorneys fees and costs and the request that Stone Pigman be found in contempt, are DENIED for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/12/2013. (tsf)
|
June 7, 2013 |
Filing
104
ORDER AND REASONS dismissing as moot 96 Motion to Stay Disqualification Orders. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/7/2013. (tsf)
|
May 17, 2013 |
Filing
73
ORDER AND REASONS dismissing as moot plaintiffs' request for preliminary injunctive relief. FURTHER ORDER denying plaintiffs' request for permanent injunctive relief. FURTHER ORDER granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs request for declaratory judgment, as stated herein. FURTHER ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants requests for writs of mandamus, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/17/2013. (tsf)
|
May 6, 2013 |
Filing
30
ORDER AND REASONS that Stone Pigman is DISQUALIFIED as counsel of record for Brennan's, Inc. in this matter and any matter consolidated herewith. FURTHER ORDER that Brennan's, Inc. shall enroll new counsel no later than May 7, 2013, at 12:00 pm noon. Failure to comply may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/6/2013. (tsf)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Brennan et al v. Brennan et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Bert Clark Brennan |
Represented By: |
Jean-Paul Layrisson |
Represented By: |
Carl Victor Welsh, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Blake W Brennan |
Represented By: |
Jean-Paul Layrisson |
Represented By: |
Carl Victor Welsh, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Owen E Brennan, Jr |
Represented By: |
Jean-Paul Layrisson |
Represented By: |
Carl Victor Welsh, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Brennan's, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Jacques Francois Bezou |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Bridget Brennan Tyrrell |
Represented By: |
Andrew D. Mendez |
Represented By: |
Phillip A. Wittmann |
Represented By: |
Carmelite M. Bertaut |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Theodore Brennan |
Represented By: |
Phillip A. Wittmann |
Represented By: |
Andrew D. Mendez |
Represented By: |
Carmelite M. Bertaut |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: Bert Clark Brennan |
Represented By: |
Jean-Paul Layrisson |
Represented By: |
Carl Victor Welsh, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: Owen E Brennan, Jr |
Represented By: |
Jean-Paul Layrisson |
Represented By: |
Carl Victor Welsh, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: Blake W Brennan |
Represented By: |
Jean-Paul Layrisson |
Represented By: |
Carl Victor Welsh, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_defendant: Theodore Brennan |
Represented By: |
Carmelite M. Bertaut |
Represented By: |
Andrew D. Mendez |
Represented By: |
Phillip A. Wittmann |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_defendant: Bridget Brennan Tyrrell |
Represented By: |
Carmelite M. Bertaut |
Represented By: |
Andrew D. Mendez |
Represented By: |
Phillip A. Wittmann |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_defendant: Brennan's, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Jacques Francois Bezou |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?