Edge v. Stalder, et al
Plaintiff: |
Barry S Edge |
Defendant: |
David Bonnett, N Burl Cain, John Doe, Doug Durrett, Jimmy Johnson, Joseph Lamartinire, Paul Perkins, John Roe, Richard L. Stalder and Ronald Welch |
Case Number: |
3:2001cv00009 |
Filed: |
January 2, 2001 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana |
Office: |
Baton Rouge Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Ralph E. Tyson |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard L. Bourgeois |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 22, 2016 |
Filing
56
RULING Adopting the 53 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 44 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Perkins are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/21/2016. (LLH)
|
May 27, 2014 |
Filing
16
ORDER granting 15 Motion to Lift Stay. The plaintiff's individual claims asserted in Civil Action No. 01-0009-RET-RLB be de-consolidated from Civil Action No. 00-0940-RET-RLB, and that Civil Action No. 01-0009-RET-RLB be re-assigned to the Honorable Judge James J. Brady. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 05/27/2014. (CGP)
|
March 6, 2014 |
Filing
13
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, sua sponte, that within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, plaintiff Barry Edge shall appear, in writing, and advise the Court whether he wishes to have the stay entered in these proceedings lifted and to rei nstate his action on the Courts Docket. The plaintiff is advised that a failure to respond to this Order will be interpreted by the Court as an indication that the plaintiff does not wish to proceed further with this case and will result in a d ismissal of the plaintiffs claims without further notice from the Court. The plaintiff is further advised that, notwithstanding the pendency of appellate proceedings in his criminal case, he will be required to respond openly to discovery in his civil action or face potential sanctions upon his failure to do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 03/06/2014. (CGP)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Edge v. Stalder, et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: David Bonnett |
Represented By: |
Michael Reese Davis, Sr. |
Represented By: |
L. J. Hymel, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: N Burl Cain |
Represented By: |
Michael Reese Davis, Sr. |
Represented By: |
L. J. Hymel, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: John Doe |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Doug Durrett |
Represented By: |
Michael Reese Davis, Sr. |
Represented By: |
L. J. Hymel, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Jimmy Johnson |
Represented By: |
Michael Reese Davis, Sr. |
Represented By: |
L. J. Hymel, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Joseph Lamartinire |
Represented By: |
Michael Reese Davis, Sr. |
Represented By: |
L. J. Hymel, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Paul Perkins |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: John Roe |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Richard L. Stalder |
Represented By: |
Michael Reese Davis, Sr. |
Represented By: |
L. J. Hymel, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Ronald Welch |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Barry S Edge |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?