Jackson et al v. Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC et al

Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company, Turner Industries, LLC, Monsanto Company, Melinda Sanford, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, The Shaw Group, Inc., Mark Graham and Todd Bartow
Plaintiff: Roshaunda Jackson, J.C.D. and Cornell Dukes
Case Number: 3:2012cv00581
Filed: September 20, 2012
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Amend Notice of Removal. The removing defendant Syngenta CropProtection, LLC shall have 14 days to file an Amended Notice of Removal which clarifies its organizational form, and if it is a limited liability company properly alleges its citizenship. Alternatively, the defendant may file an amended answer which does the same thing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 06/04/2013. (CGP)
July 1, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 33 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 20 Motion to Remand is denied. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 07/01/2013. (CGP)
July 23, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Plaintiffs' 45 Motion to Amend Order and Stay Proceedings and to have this matter certified for immediate interlocutory appeal is denied. Signed by District Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/23/13. (DCB)
August 7, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 43 Motion for Entry of Lone Pine Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/7/2013. (SMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner Industries, LLC
Represented By: Thomas E. Balhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Luis Arturo Leitzelar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Sanford
Represented By: Kathleen F. Drew
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen F. Drew
Represented By: Mark Christopher Surprenant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Shaw Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Ferachi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Graham
Represented By: Kathleen F. Drew
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Bartow
Represented By: Kathleen F. Drew
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roshaunda Jackson
Represented By: Miracle De' Haven Myles
Represented By: Donald W. Price
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.C.D.
Represented By: Donald W. Price
Represented By: Miracle De' Haven Myles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornell Dukes
Represented By: Donald W. Price
Represented By: Miracle De' Haven Myles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]