Nalls et al v. LaSalle

Defendant: Annette LaSalle and Ashley Breaux
Plaintiff: Michael Howard Nalls
Case Number: 3:2013cv00103
Filed: February 19, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Richard L. Bourgeois
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 12 Motion to Dismiss as to Judge Lasalle. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/6/2013. (LLH)
August 1, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 18 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Ashley Breaux. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/1/2013. (LLH)
September 5, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying Plaintiffs 40 Motion for Reconsideration of Ruling Denying Motion to Amend and Supplement; denying Plaintiffs 41 Motion for Reconsideration of Ruling Dismissing Ashley Breaux. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/5/2013. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nalls et al v. LaSalle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette LaSalle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Breaux
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Howard Nalls
Represented By: Chris DeWayne Nalls
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]