Southern Filter Media, LLC v. Halter

Defendant: Timothy P Halter
Plaintiff: Southern Filter Media, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00116
Filed: February 26, 2013
 
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Richard L. Bourgeois
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER denying 8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Improper Venue, and Failure to State a Claim.Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/3/2013. (LLH)
March 18, 2014 44 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses. Defendant shall supplement its discovery responses as set forth no later than 4/1/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 3/18/2014. (SMG)
July 29, 2014 75 Featured Case ORDER denying 49 Motion to Compel a Discovery Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 7/29/2014. (SMG)
August 4, 2014 76 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Second Motion to Compel Discovery Responses. Defendant shall supplement its discovery responses as set forth above no later than 8/18/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 8/4/2014. (SMG)
August 29, 2014 87 Featured Case RULING and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 55 Motion for Protective Order Quashing or Limiting the Discovery Sought by Timothy P. Halter and 56 Second Motion to Compel. SFM shall supplement its discovery responses as set forth above no later than 30 days after the date of this Order. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr on 8/29/2014. (SMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Southern Filter Media, LLC v. Halter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy P Halter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Filter Media, LLC
Represented By: Keith Fernandez
Represented By: Connell Lee Archey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]