Collins v. Foster

Defendant: Trish Foster
Plaintiff: Jauve Collins
Case Number: 3:2013cv00232
Filed: April 11, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 5 , 6 and 8 Motions to Prove Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 06/04/2013. (SMG) Modified to edit doc type on 6/5/2013 (SMG).
July 19, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 13 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 07/19/2013. (SMG)
July 19, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying as frivolous 16 Motion to Recuse the Attorney General from Represents the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 07/19/2013. (SMG)
December 10, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 30 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, denying as moot 33 Motion to Compel and 39 Motion to Re-urge Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/9/2013. (LLH)
August 13, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER Adopting the 72 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Defendant's 53 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 64 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Plaintiffs access to courts cl aim is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §I9I5(e)(2)(B)(ii), AND WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND, because there is no conceivable, non-frivolous federal access to the courts claim Plaintiff can assert against Defendant consistent with the facts alleged in Plaintiffs complaint as expanded by the information provided at the Spears hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/13/2014. (LLH)
August 13, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER Adopting the 73 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and denying 71 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and/or Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/13/2014. (LLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Foster
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trish Foster
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jauve Collins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]