Bridges et al v. Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP et al

Defendant: Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc., Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP, Coastal Chemical Co., L.L.C., ENSCO Offshore Company, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Montello Inc, Murphy Exploration & Production Company, Murphy Exploration & Production Company - USA, Nico Supply Co., Inc., Noble Drilling Corporation, Shell Oil Company and Union Carbide Corporation
Plaintiff: David Bridges, John Courtney, Jerry Freeman, Sr., Wyman Fuller, Percy Hall, James Hardy, Terry Keith, Jerry Kitchens, Sr., Randy Newsome, Sr., Thomas Sullivan and Willie Thompson
Notice Only: David C. Gibbons and David Y. Lamm
Case Number: 3:2013cv00477
Filed: July 22, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Affirming and Adopting 33 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/18/2013. (CGP)
November 22, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Shell Oil Company's Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6), For Leave to Perform Jurisdictional Discovery, and For a More Definite Statement Under Rule 12(c) is granted, in part. The motion is granted insofar as the defendant sough t an order requiring the plaintiffs to file an amended petition which clarifies the factual basis for each plaintiff's Jones Act claim against the defendant. Plaintiffs shall have until 12/6/2013 to file their amended petition. The other aspects of the defendant's motion are denied, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/22/2013. (JDL)
February 20, 2015 75 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 53 , 54 Motions to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6), For Leave to Perform Jurisdictional Discovery, and, Alternatively, For a More Definite Statement Under Rule 12(e). Plaintiffs shall have until 3/6/2015 to file their amended petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 02/20/2015. (BCL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridges et al v. Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP
Represented By: Kathleen F. Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Chemical Co., L.L.C.
Represented By: Campbell Edington Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENSCO Offshore Company
Represented By: Delos E. Flint, Jr.
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.
Represented By: Tam Catherine Bourgeois
Represented By: Katie Dampier Chabert
Represented By: Lexi T. Holinga
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Lascaro
Represented By: John Allain Viator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montello Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Exploration & Production Company
Represented By: James H. Daigle
Represented By: Robert S. Emmett
Represented By: Christopher M. Hannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Exploration & Production Company - USA
Represented By: James H. Daigle
Represented By: Robert S. Emmett
Represented By: Christopher M. Hannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nico Supply Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Drilling Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Coreil
Represented By: Ben Louis Mayeaux
Represented By: Jed M. Mestayer
Represented By: Francis X. Neuner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Represented By: Gary A. Bezet
Represented By: Janice Marie Culotta
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Represented By: Carol Louise Galloway
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Barrye Panepinto Miyagi
Represented By: Gayla M. Moncla
Represented By: Sarah K. Weissman
Represented By: Anthony M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Michael H. Abraham
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: Deborah Kuchler
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bridges
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Courtney
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Freeman, Sr.
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyman Fuller
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Percy Hall
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hardy
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Keith
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Kitchens, Sr.
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Newsome, Sr.
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Sullivan
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Thompson
Represented By: Tammy Dianne Harris
Represented By: Timothy Justin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: David C. Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: David Y. Lamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]