Darville v. Turner Industries Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Sherin Darville
Defendant: Turner Industrial Maintenance, LLC and Turner Industries Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00625
Filed: September 20, 2013
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Brian A. Jackson
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Plaintiff's Motion for Extension to Respond, Request of the Court to Intervene or to be the Mediator, and her Motion to Respond to Status Report Issues are denied. Plaintiff's Request to Add Laborer Union 1177 [and] Laborer Union 68 9, treated as a motion for leave to amend the amended complaint, is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 4(m), FRCP, the plaintiff is granted until 04/03/2014 to serve defendants Construction and General Laborers Union 1177 and Labor ers International of North America Local 689 with a summons, her amended complaint, the Request to Add Laborer Union 1177 [and] Laborer Union 689, and this order. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of the plaintiffs claims against these defendants without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 03/03/2014. (NLT)
February 20, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 34 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims with Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 2/20/2015. (LLH)
May 15, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER DENYING 51 Motion to Set Aside Sanctions and to Seek Review by District Judge (28 USC s 636 (B) (1) (C) (B)) [sic]; 57 Motion for Designation of Case as Complex Litigation; 59 Motion for Continuance of Summary Judgement [sic] a nd Opposition to Summary Judgement [sic]; 66 Motion for Continuance of Summary Judgment and Opposition to Summary Judgement [sic]. Turner Industries' 54 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 05/14/2015. (BCL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darville v. Turner Industries Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherin Darville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner Industrial Maintenance, LLC
Represented By: Phyllis Guin Cancienne
Represented By: Elizabeth Harper Emmett
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Amelia Williams Koch
Represented By: Malcolm Levy Leatherman
Represented By: Christopher G. Morris
Represented By: Kathlyn G. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner Industries Group, LLC
Represented By: Phyllis Guin Cancienne
Represented By: Elizabeth Harper Emmett
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Amelia Williams Koch
Represented By: Malcolm Levy Leatherman
Represented By: Christopher G. Morris
Represented By: Kathlyn G. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.