Martco Limited Partnership v. Bruks-Klockner Inc

Plaintiff: Martco Limited Partnership
Defendant: Bruks-Klockner Inc
 
Case Number: 2:2007cv02002
Filed: November 20, 2007
 
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Allen
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
Referring Judge: Alonzo P Wilson
 
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2011 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 206 Motion for Reconsideration re 204 Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 4/19/11. (crt,Finn, P)
July 5, 2011 305 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 253 Motion for Certificate of Appealability ; denying 253 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 7/5/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
June 1, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 62 MOTION to Dismiss Claims in Third-Party Complaint filed by Mid-South Engineering Co is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 05/27/2010. (crt,Benoit, J)
August 3, 2010 93 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING denying 75 MOTION for Reconsideration re 69 Memorandum Ruling, 70 Order on Motion to Dismiss, filed by Bruks Inc. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 8/2/10. (crt,MonceauxSld, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Martco Limited Partnership v. Bruks-Klockner Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martco Limited Partnership
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruks-Klockner Inc
Represented By: Alan H Goodman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]