Constance et al v. Austral Oil Exploration Co Inc et al

Plaintiff: Mae Doris Constance Little, Ruby Mae Simon Constance, Debora Constance Dixon, Robert Joseph Constance, Sheila Constance Miller, Chad Constance, Georgia Authement Constance, Georgia Authement Constance Revocable Living Trust, Roxanne Constance Stelly, Gene Allen Constance, Benji Constance Duhon, Jackson Constance, John Theodore Constance and Rose Ann Constance Burch
Defendant: Austral Oil Exploration Co Inc, Williams Exploration Co, Wainoco Oil & Gas Co, Diasu Oil & Gas Co Inc, McCormick Operating Co, Beem Oil & Gas Co, Chevron U S A Inc and ExxonMobil Oil Corp
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01252
Filed: May 16, 2012
 
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lake Charles Office
County: Calcasieu
Referring Judge: Kathleen Kay
Presiding Judge: Patricia Minaldi
 
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2013 110 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING Wainoco's Motion 65 is GRANTED IN PART, AND DENIED IN PART. As a result, Wainoco's previous Motions ( 23 ; 26 in case no. 2:12-cv-1523) are DENIED AS MOOT. Beem's Motion 88 is GRANTED IN PART, AND DENIED IN PA RT. As a result, Beem's previous Motion 51 is DENIED AS MOOT. The Motion for Preliminary Hearing 78 is DENIED. As a result, the plaintiffs' Motion to Strike 100 is DENIED AS MOOT. BP's Motion 85 is DENIED. Smith's Motion ( 61 in case no. 2:12-cv-1253 is GRANTED IN PART, AND DENIED IN PART. Duncan's Motion ( 100 in case no. 2:12-cv-1253) is GRANTED IN PART, AND DENIED IN PART.. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 12/13/13. (crt,FinnSld, P)
December 13, 2013 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Wainoco's Motion 65 is GRANTED IN PART, AND DENIED IN PART. As a result, Wainoco's previous Motions ( 23 ; 26 in case no. 2:12-cv-1523) are DENIED AS MOOT. Beem's Motion 88 is GRANTED IN PART, AND DENIED IN PART. As a result, Bee m's previous Motion 51 is DENIED AS MOOT. The Motion for Preliminary Hearing 78 is DENIED. As a result, the plaintiffs' Motion to Strike 100 is DENIED AS MOOT. BP's Motion 85 is DENIED. Smith's Motion ( 61 in case no. 2:12-cv-1253 is GRANTED IN PART, AND DENIED IN PART. Duncan's Motion ( 100 in case no. 2:12-cv-1253) is GRANTED IN PART, AND DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 12/13/13. (crt,FinnSld, P)
February 6, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING denying 21 Motion to Remand; granting 33 Motion to Amend/Correct Notice of Removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 2/6/2013. (crt,Dauterive, C)
June 7, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 44 Report and Recommendations; IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff's claims against Austral Oil Exploration Co., Inc., be DISMISSED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, Austral Oil Exploration Co., Inc., was the only non-diverse defendant who could destroy diversity jurisdiction, the Magistrate Judge's decision denying the plaintiffs' Motion to Remand is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Patricia Minaldi on 6/5/2013. (crt,FinnSld, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Constance et al v. Austral Oil Exploration Co Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mae Doris Constance Little
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: Chad E Mudd
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Michael Keith Prudhomme
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Mae Simon Constance
Represented By: Michael Keith Prudhomme
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Chad E Mudd
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debora Constance Dixon
Represented By: Chad E Mudd
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Michael Keith Prudhomme
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Joseph Constance
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: Chad E Mudd
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Michael Keith Prudhomme
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Constance Miller
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: Chad E Mudd
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Michael Keith Prudhomme
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Constance
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: Chad E Mudd
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Michael Keith Prudhomme
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Authement Constance
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: Chad E Mudd
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Michael Keith Prudhomme
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Authement Constance Revocable Living Trust
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: Chad E Mudd
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Michael Keith Prudhomme
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Constance Stelly
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: Chad E Mudd
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Michael Keith Prudhomme
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Allen Constance
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: Chad E Mudd
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Michael Keith Prudhomme
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benji Constance Duhon
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: Chad E Mudd
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Michael Keith Prudhomme
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson Constance
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: Chad E Mudd
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Michael Keith Prudhomme
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Theodore Constance
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: Chad E Mudd
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Michael Keith Prudhomme
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Ann Constance Burch
Represented By: David P Bruchhaus
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: John S Dupont, III
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: Chad E Mudd
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Michael Keith Prudhomme
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austral Oil Exploration Co Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Exploration Co
Represented By: Esteban Herrera, Jr
Represented By: Leonard L Kilgore, III
Represented By: Mark A Marionneaux
Represented By: Richard Dean McConnell, Jr
Represented By: Victor Jacob Suane, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wainoco Oil & Gas Co
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diasu Oil & Gas Co Inc
Represented By: Frank S Craig, III
Represented By: John Baird King
Represented By: William Brett Mason
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCormick Operating Co
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beem Oil & Gas Co
Represented By: Demarcus Johnathan Gordon
Represented By: Kelly D Perrier
Represented By: Loulan Joseph Pitre, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U S A Inc
Represented By: Alan J Berteau
Represented By: Louis V Gregoire, Jr
Represented By: Louis Matthew Grossman
Represented By: Charles S McCowan, III
Represented By: Michael R Phillips
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Oil Corp
Represented By: Tiffany Delery Davis
Represented By: James Edward Lapeze
Represented By: Michael A Mahone, Jr
Represented By: Robert B McNeal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]