Hughes et al v. Pogo Producing Co et al

 
Case Number: 6:2006cv01894
Filed: October 20, 2006
 
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
 
Nature of Suit: Marine Product Liability
Cause of Action: 43:1331 General Maritime/OCSLA
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Discovery Producer Services L L C. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 1/7/09. (crt,Roaix, G)
February 12, 2009 133 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by E N I U S Operating Co Inc, E N I Petroleum U S L L C is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 02/12/09. (crt,Guidry, C)
February 20, 2009 140 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pogo Producing Co, 113 MOTION for Oral Argument filed by Pogo Producing Co. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 2/20/2009. (crt,Keifer, K)
March 3, 2009 145 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 121 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Atlantia Corp, Atlantia Offshore Ltd and 122 MOTION for Oral Argument re 121 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 3/2/2009. (crt,Keifer, K)
March 11, 2009 151 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 119 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Discovery Producer Services L L C. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 3/11/2009. (crt,Keifer, K)
July 6, 2009 165 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting in part and denying in part 153 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Chopin Wagar shall not be permitted to represent both Pogo and Wood in this matter. Chopin Wagar shall notify both Pogo and Wood of this ruling. Thereafter, Chopin Wagar is to confer with both clients and file a motion to withdraw and/or substitute counsel for either Pogo or Wood by 7/17/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 7/2/2009. (crt,Keifer, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hughes et al v. Pogo Producing Co et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]